Hospital Management Associates, LLC et al v. Williamson Memorial Hospital, LLC et al
Plaintiff: CHSPSC, LLC, Hospital Management Associates, LLC and Phyisican Practice Support, LLC
Defendant: Williamson Memorial Hospital, LLC and Mingo Health Partners, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00706
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 12/10/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 12/23/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 12/30/2019. Scheduling Conference at 10:00 AM on 1/13/2020. Entry of Scheduling Order 1/21/2020. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 1/27/2020. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 11/19/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (ts)
November 14, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by Mingo Health Partners, LLC to Dismiss #1 Complaint. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Farrell, Michael) (Modified on 11/14/2019 to add link to #1 complaint) (kew).
October 25, 2019 Filing 12 JOINT STIPULATION Mingo Health Partners, LLC shall have until 11/13/2019 to answer or otherwise respond to #1 Complaint by Mingo Health Partners, LLC, Hospital Management Associates, LLC, CHSPSC, LLC, Phyisican Practice Support, LLC. (Farrell, Michael) (Modified on 10/28/2019 to add link to #1 complaint and to add party filers) (kew).
October 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Bankruptcy Case Filing by Williamson Memorial Hospital, LLC. (Attachment: #1 Cover Letter) (kew)
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 10/1/2019 as to Mingo Health Partners, LLC. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002590779. (ts)
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 10/1/2019 as to Williamson Memorial Hospital, LLC. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002590786. (ts)
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiff Phyisican Practice Support, LLC (Hurney, Thomas)
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiff CHSPSC, LLC (Hurney, Thomas)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiff Hospital Management Associates, LLC (Hurney, Thomas)
September 30, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. (klc)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mingo Health Partners, LLC, Williamson Memorial Hospital, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachment: #1 Summons as to Williamson Memorial Hospital, LLC) (kew)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Phyisican Practice Support, LLC, Hospital Management Associates, LLC, CHSPSC, LLC for Mingo Health Partners, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. (Hurney, Thomas)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Hospital Management Associates, LLC for Williamson Memorial Hospital, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. (Hurney, Thomas)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (ts)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7397915. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hospital Management Associates, LLC et al v. Williamson Memorial Hospital, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williamson Memorial Hospital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mingo Health Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHSPSC, LLC
Represented By: Thomas J. Hurney, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hospital Management Associates, LLC
Represented By: Thomas J. Hurney, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyisican Practice Support, LLC
Represented By: Thomas J. Hurney, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?