Presley v. Shine Electrical Group et al
Plaintiff: Shannon Presley
Defendant: Shine Electrical Group, Sam's Club #6457 and Sam's East, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00750
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sam's East, Inc. for First Set of Combined Discovery Requests to Plaintiff. (Noel, Heather)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER directing the Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 12/06/2019 is CANCELED and this case shall proceed as follows: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 2/10/2020. Discovery requests to be completed by 8/4/2020. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 6/1/2020, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 7/15/2020, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 7/29/2020. Discovery to close by 9/18/2019. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 10/8/2020, with responses due by 10/22/2020, and replies due by 10/29/2020. Settlement Meeting to be held by 12/9/2020. Motions in Limine to be filed by 12/16/2020, with responses due by 12/23/2020. Plaintiffs portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 12/14/2020, Integrated Pretrial Order by 12/21/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 1/14/2021 at 2:00 PM before Judge Thomas E. Johnston. Jury Instructions and Voir Dire by 1/19/2021. Final Settlement Conference at 2:00 PM on 1/14/2021. Jury Trial set for 1/26/2021 at 9:00 AM before Judge Thomas E. Johnston. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 12/4/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER The Court DISMISSES WITH PREJUDICE Sam's Club #6457 as a party to this action and ORDERS that Sam's East, Inc. be substituted as a defendant in this case. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 12/3/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER Agreed Order Dismissing Sam's Club #6457 and Substituting Sam's East Inc. by Sam's Club #6457, Shannon Presley, Shine Electrical Group. (Noel, Heather) (Modified on 11/27/2019 to add party filers) (kew).
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Sam's Club #6457, Shine Electrical Group, Shannon Presley. (Noel, Heather) (Modified on 11/27/2019 to add party filers) (kew).
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 11/18/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 11/25/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 12/2/2019. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 2:00 PM on 12/6/2019. Entry of Scheduling Order 12/11/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 12/20/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 11/4/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (mms)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER TO #3 Crossclaim by Shine Electrical Group. (Hanna, William)
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Shine Electrical Group (Hanna, William)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Shine Electrical Group. (Hanna, William) (Modified on 10/23/2019 to correct link) (kew).
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Sam's Club #6457 (Noel, Heather)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sam's Club #6457 and CROSSCLAIM by Sam's Club #6457 against Shine Electrical Group. (Noel, Heather) (Modified on 10/21/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kew).
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mms)
October 15, 2019 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sam's Club #6457 with summons, complaint, other miscellaneous documents and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7413919. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (mms) (Modified on 10/16/2019 to replace exhibit C) (ts).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Presley v. Shine Electrical Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Presley
Represented By: Thomas D. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shine Electrical Group
Represented By: Evan Aldridge
Represented By: William J. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's Club #6457
Represented By: Heather M. Noel
Represented By: Sara E. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's East, Inc.
Represented By: Heather M. Noel
Represented By: Sara E. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?