Stillwagon v. Goldman Sachs Bank USA
Plaintiff: James Stillwagon
Defendant: Goldman Sachs Bank USA
Case Number: 2:2019cv00764
Filed: October 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO #1 COMPLAINT to 1/8/2020 by Goldman Sachs Bank USA, James Stillwagon. (Arthur, Aaron) (Modified on 12/11/2019 to correct link and to add party filer) (kew).
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO #1 COMPLAINT to 1/8/2020 by Goldman Sachs Bank USA, James Stillwagon. (Arthur, Aaron) (Modified on 12/11/2019 to add link to #1 complaint and to add party filer) (kew).
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO #1 COMPLAINT to 12/11/2019 by Goldman Sachs Bank USA, James Stillwagon. (Arthur, Aaron) (Modified on 11/13/2019 to add link to #1 complaint and to add party filer) (kew).
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 10/23/2019 as to Goldman Sachs Bank USA. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002601765. (ts)
October 21, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
October 21, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 Complaint. ERROR: Civil action number omitted. CORRECTION: Civil action number added and image replaced. (kew)
October 21, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Goldman Sachs Bank USA, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (mms)
October 21, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mms)
October 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7420054. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons as to Goldman Sachs Bank USA, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (mms) (Modified on 10/21/2019 to add civil action number and replace image) (kew).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stillwagon v. Goldman Sachs Bank USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Stillwagon
Represented By: Benjamin Sheridan
Represented By: Megan Alicia Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs Bank USA
Represented By: Aaron N. Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?