Trustees of the West Virginia Laborers' Pension Trust Fund et al v. Cofano Energy Services, LLC
Plaintiff: West Virginia Laborers' Local No. 379, West Virginia Laborers' Local No. 984, Trustees of the West Virginia Laborers' Pension Trust Fund, Trustees of the West Virginia Laborers' Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, West Virginia Laborers' District Council-Political Action Committee, West Virginia Laborers' Local No. 1353, West Virginia Laborers' Political League, Trustees of the West Virginia Laborers' Organizing Fund, West Virginia Laborers' Local No. 1085, Trustees of the West Virginia Laborers' Profit Sharing Plan Trust Fund, Trustees of the West Virginia Laborers' Training Trust Fund and Trustees of the West Virginia Laborers' Trust Fund
Defendant: Cofano Energy Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00806
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cofano Energy Services, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachment: #1 Summons as to Cofano Energy Services, LLC) (kew)
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Trustees of the West Virginia Laborers' Pension Trust Fund, Trustees of the West Virginia Laborers' Profit Sharing Plan Trust Fund, West Virginia Laborers' Local No. 379, Trustees of the West Virginia Laborers' Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, West Virginia Laborers' Political League, West Virginia Laborers' Local No. 984, Trustees of the West Virginia Laborers' Organizing Fund, Trustees of the West Virginia Laborers' Training Trust Fund, West Virginia Laborers' District Council-Political Action Committee, Trustees of the West Virginia Laborers' Trust Fund, West Virginia Laborers' Local No. 1353, West Virginia Laborers' Local No. 1085 for Cofano Energy Services, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. (Williams, Roger) (Modified on 1/6/2020 to add link to #1 complaint) (kew).
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Trustees of the West Virginia Laborers' Pension Trust Fund, Trustees of the West Virginia Laborers' Profit Sharing Plan Trust Fund, West Virginia Laborers' Local No. 379, Trustees of the West Virginia Laborers' Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, West Virginia Laborers' Political League, West Virginia Laborers' Local No. 984, Trustees of the West Virginia Laborers' Organizing Fund, Trustees of the West Virginia Laborers' Training Trust Fund, West Virginia Laborers' District Council-Political Action Committee, Trustees of the West Virginia Laborers' Trust Fund, West Virginia Laborers' Local No. 1353, West Virginia Laborers' Local No. 1085 for Cofano Energy Services, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. (Williams, Roger)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
November 12, 2019 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7458105. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the West Virginia Laborers' Pension Trust Fund et al v. Cofano Energy Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Virginia Laborers' Local No. 379
Represented By: Roger D. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Virginia Laborers' Local No. 984
Represented By: Roger D. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the West Virginia Laborers' Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Roger D. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the West Virginia Laborers' Employers Cooperation and Education Trust
Represented By: Roger D. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Virginia Laborers' District Council-Political Action Committee
Represented By: Roger D. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Virginia Laborers' Local No. 1353
Represented By: Roger D. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Virginia Laborers' Political League
Represented By: Roger D. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the West Virginia Laborers' Organizing Fund
Represented By: Roger D. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Virginia Laborers' Local No. 1085
Represented By: Roger D. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the West Virginia Laborers' Profit Sharing Plan Trust Fund
Represented By: Roger D. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the West Virginia Laborers' Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Roger D. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the West Virginia Laborers' Trust Fund
Represented By: Roger D. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cofano Energy Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?