Harbaum v. TransCanada USA Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ernie Harbaum
Defendant: TransCanada USA Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00844
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joseph R Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Consent by Ernie Harbaum (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Jones, Taylor)
January 13, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for TransCanada USA Services, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. TransCanada USA Services, Inc. served on 12/11/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Dunlap, Andrew) (Modified on 1/13/2020 to remove link to #2 summons) (kew).
January 8, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Andrew W. Dunlap updating name and/or firm information on behalf of Ernie Harbaum. (Dunlap, Andrew)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 1/28/2020. Rule 26(f) Meeting 2/10/2020. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 2/18/2020. Scheduling Conference at 9:00 AM on 3/2/2020 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 3/9/2020. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 3/16/2020. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/8/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (kew)
January 2, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by TransCanada USA Services, Inc. (Danaher, Maria) (Modified on 1/2/2020 to add jury demand) (kew).
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing of Consent by Ernie Harbaum (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A - Dubose Consent)(Majestro, Anthony)
December 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing of Consent by Ernie Harbaum (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A - Cypert Consent)(Majestro, Anthony)
December 12, 2019 Filing 7 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Andrew Dunlap on behalf of Ernie Harbaum. Local counsel: Anthony J Majestro. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7484996. (Majestro, Anthony)
December 12, 2019 Filing 6 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Taylor Jones on behalf of Ernie Harbaum. Local counsel: Anthony J Majestro. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7484990. (Majestro, Anthony)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
December 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Exhibit A to #1 Complaint by Ernie Harbaum. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Majestro, Anthony) (Modified on 12/11/2019 to convert event to exhibits in support) (kew).
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Notices of Consent by Ernie Harbaum. (Majestro, Anthony)
November 26, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. (klc)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to TransCanada USA Services, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (lca)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7472896. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (lca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harbaum v. TransCanada USA Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransCanada USA Services, Inc.
Represented By: Maria Greco Danaher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernie Harbaum
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: James S. Nelson
Represented By: Andrew W. Dunlap
Represented By: Taylor Ashley Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?