Heaster v. Northeast Natural Energy, LLC
Plaintiff: Adam Heaster
Defendant: Northeast Natural Energy, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00887
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Adam Heaster for Initial Disclosures. (Jones, Taylor)
January 13, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #11 Summons Returned Executed. ERROR: Second page of summons omitted. CORRECTION: Page added and image replaced. (kew)
January 13, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for Northeast Natural Energy, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Northeast Natural Energy, LLC served on 12/13/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (Dunlap, Andrew) (Modified on 1/13/2020 to remove link to #2 summons and to add second page and replace image) (kew).
January 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Andrew W. Dunlap updating name and/or firm information on behalf of Adam Heaster. (Dunlap, Andrew)
January 8, 2020 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Northeast Natural Energy, LLC (Leonoro, Joseph)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 1/29/2020. Rule 26(f) Meeting 2/5/2020. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 2/12/2020. Scheduling Conference at 3:30 PM on 2/26/2020 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 3/4/2020. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 3/11/2020. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 1/6/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)
January 3, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint by Northeast Natural Energy, LLC. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Leonoro, Joseph)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Taylor A. Jones on behalf of Adam Heaster. Local counsel: Anthony J Majestro. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7493218. (Majestro, Anthony)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Andrew W. Dunlap on behalf of Adam Heaster. Local counsel: Anthony J Majestro. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7493214. (Majestro, Anthony)
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER FOR ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES OF CIVIL ACTIONS ASSIGNED TO JUDGE IRENE C. BERGER ENTERED NOVEMBER 12, 2019. This matter referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn for Discovery. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
December 12, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Exhibit A to #1 Complaint by Adam Heaster. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Majestro, Anthony) (Modified on 12/13/2019 to convert event to exhibits in support) (kew).
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Northeast Natural Energy, LLC, re: #1 Collective Action Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (kew)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7484935. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons as to Northeast Natural Energy, LLC, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (kew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heaster v. Northeast Natural Energy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northeast Natural Energy, LLC
Represented By: Joseph U. Leonoro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Heaster
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: James S. Nelson
Represented By: Andrew W. Dunlap
Represented By: Taylor Ashley Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?