Sayer Brothers, Inc. v. Colony Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Sayer Brothers, Inc.
Defendant: Brian Farrelly and Colony Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00040
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2020 Filing 5 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Sayer Brothers, Inc., Colony Insurance Company, Brian Farrelly. (Attachment: #1 Worksheet)(Kesner, Brent) (Modified on 3/10/2020 to add party filers) (kew).
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 2/24/2020. Rule 26(f) Meeting 3/9/2020. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 3/16/2020. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 2:30 PM on 3/23/2020. Entry of Scheduling Order 3/30/2020. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 4/6/2020. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 1/27/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts)
January 22, 2020 SET ANSWER DEADLINES for Colony Insurance Company and Brian Farrelly to 3/19/2020. (kew)
January 22, 2020 Filing 3 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME PERIOD FOR COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY AND BRIAN FARRELLY TO FILE AN ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL to 3/19/2020 by Colony Insurance Company, Brian Farrelly, Sayer Brothers, Inc. (Farrell, Michael) (Modified on 1/22/2020 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add party filer) (kew).
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
January 15, 2020 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Brian Farrelly, Colony Insurance Company with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7514448. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (st)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sayer Brothers, Inc. v. Colony Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sayer Brothers, Inc.
Represented By: Robert V. Berthold, Jr.
Represented By: Ernest G. Hentschel, II
Represented By: Robert V. Berthold, III
Represented By: Brent K. Kesner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Farrelly
Represented By: Michael J. Farrell
Represented By: Jayson T. Hamrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colony Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael J. Farrell
Represented By: Jayson T. Hamrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?