Parsons v. Board of Trustees of the Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust
Plaintiff: Alma Parsons
Defendant: Board of Trustees of the Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust
Case Number: 2:2020cv00132
Filed: February 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2020 Filing 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the Ohio Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-02800. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order of Transfer. Under 29 U.S.C. 1132(e)(2), a venue for an ERISA action is proper "where the breach took place." In this instance, that location is West Virginia -- where Plaintiff resides. With agreement of all parties, this case is transferred to the Southern District of West Virginia (Charleston Division). Judge Jack Zouhary on 2/11/2020. (D,L) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/18/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. Phone Status held on 2/7/20. Court reviewed with counsel correspondence discussing the appropriate venue for this case. Court proposed a transfer of this case with agreement of all parties to the Southern District of West Virginia (Charleston Division), and also offered to assist with settlement. Counsel will consult with their respective clients and advise Court by e-mail by 2/14/20. (20 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 2/7/20. (S,Na) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/18/2020.]
February 3, 2020 LAST NOTICE: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. In order to complete our final transition to NextGen, CM/ECF will be offline starting at 12:00 noon on Friday, February 7, 2020, through 11:59 p.m. Sunday, February 9, 2020. Pursuant to General Order 2020-02, we have established an email box, nextgenfilings@ohnd.uscourts.gov, for submitting documents to be filed during this period.Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. Step one was to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your OHND e-filing account in the NextGen CM/ECF system on or after February 10, 2020. # Linking Instructions. You will be unable to e-file until the accounts are linked. If you have any additional questions, please call the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/18/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. Initial Phone Status held on 1/14/20. Court encouraged counsel to follow Civil Case Management Procedures (Doc. #3 ) and have a full and complete disclosure with each other about the merits of potential motion practice. Phone Status to discuss the matter further set for 2/7/20 at 10:30 AM (EST) (note time change). Court will initiate the call. In the interim, all legal filings are stayed. (20 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 1/15/20. (S,Na) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/18/2020.]
January 10, 2020 IMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/18/2020.]
January 8, 2020 NOTICE [non-document] of Initial Phone Status set for 1/14/20 at 3:00 PM (EST) before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line. No dispositive motions shall be filed prior to the Initial Phone Status. (S,Na) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/18/2020.]
January 1, 2020 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Alma Parsons. Board of Trustees of the Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust waiver sent on 12/2/2019, answer due 1/31/2020 filed on behalf of Alma Parsons (Perlmuter, Scott) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/18/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 12/2/2019. (M,L) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/18/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a).After Defendant(s) have been served and counsel enter an appearance, this Court will promptly hold an Initial Phone Status Conference. No Motion to Dismiss may be filed in advance of this Conference. The responsive pleading deadline will be automatically tolled until that time. (M,L) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/18/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Board of Trustees of the Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,L) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/18/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/18/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (M,L) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/18/2020.]
November 29, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Board of Trustees of the Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9652720.. Filed by Alma Parsons. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Perlmuter, Scott) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/18/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parsons v. Board of Trustees of the Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alma Parsons
Represented By: Scott D. Perlmuter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees of the Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?