Scalia v. Pritchard Mining Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Eugene Scalia
Defendant: Pritchard Mining Company, Inc. Employee Health Benefit Plan and Pritchard Mining Company, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00161
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT JUDGMENT directing that this Consent Judgment operates as a final disposition of all claims asserted in the #1 Complaint and is a final order pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Senior District Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 3/13/2020. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kew)
March 12, 2020 Filing 5 TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held by Senior District Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 3/12/2020; Court Reporter: Catherine Schutte-Stant. (tmr)
March 5, 2020 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
March 4, 2020 CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
March 4, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION by Eugene Scalia to Approve and Enter Consent Judgment (Attachment: #1 Exhibit B- Proposed Consent Judgment)(Forney, Geoffrey)
March 4, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Pritchard Mining Company, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 as to Pritchard Mining Company, Inc. Employee Health Benefit Plan) (st)
March 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons as to Pritchard Mining Company, Inc., #2 Proposed Summons as to Pritchard Mining Company Inc. Employee Health Benefit Plan, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (st)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scalia v. Pritchard Mining Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pritchard Mining Company, Inc. Employee Health Benefit Plan
Represented By: David A. Hoyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pritchard Mining Company, Inc.
Represented By: David A. Hoyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Scalia
Represented By: Kate S. O'Scannlain
Represented By: Jodeen M. Hobbs
Represented By: Oscar L. Hampton, III
Represented By: Geoffrey Forney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?