Burns v. DXC Technology Company et al
Plaintiff: Pamela Burns
Defendant: DXC Technology Services LLC and DXC Technology Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00349
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 7/13/2020. Rule 26(f) Meeting 7/22/2020. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 7/29/2020. Scheduling Conference at 10:00 a.m. on 8/12/2020 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 8/19/2020. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 8/26/2020. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 6/23/2020. (cc: counsel of record and to any unrepresented party) (mms)
June 22, 2020 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendants DXC Technology Company, DXC Technology Services LLC (Harrison, Justin)
June 22, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint by DXC Technology Company, DXC Technology Services LLC.(Harrison, Justin)
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 5/28/2020 as to DXC Technology Company. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002708723. (btm)
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 5/28/2020 as to DXC Technology Services LLC. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002708716. (btm)
May 21, 2020 Filing 3 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER FOR ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES OF CIVIL ACTIONS ASSIGNED TO JUDGE IRENE C. BERGER ENTERED NOVEMBER 12, 2019. This matter referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn for Discovery. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
May 20, 2020 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to DXC Technology Company and DXC Technology Services LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachment: #1 Summons as to DXC Technology Services LLC) (mms)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7621456. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons as to DXC Technology Company, #2 Proposed Summons as to DXC Technology Services LLC, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (mms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burns v. DXC Technology Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DXC Technology Services LLC
Represented By: Justin M. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DXC Technology Company
Represented By: Justin M. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Burns
Represented By: Richard W. Walters
Represented By: Carl W. Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?