Parsons v. Kroger Limited Partnership I
Plaintiff: Lorie Parsons
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership I
Case Number: 2:2020cv00392
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 JOINT MOTION by Lorie Parsons, Kroger Limited Partnership I to Amend #16 Order: Final Settlement Conference set for 11:00 AM on 7/12/2021 in Charleston. Trial set for 7/13/2021 at 09:30 AM in Charleston before Senior Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. Signed by Senior Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 7/29/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (mk)
July 28, 2020 Filing 17 JOINT MOTION by Lorie Parsons, Kroger Limited Partnership I to Amend #16 Order. (Auvil, Walt) (Modified on 7/29/2020 to add party filer) (kew).
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER directing that the scheduling conference is cancelled and that this case shall proceed as follows: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 7/31/2020. Discovery requests to be completed by 12/29/2020. Discovery to close by 2/12/2021. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 12/14/2020, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 1/13/2021, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 1/29/2021. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 3/4/2021. Responses due by 3/18/2021. Replies due by 3/25/2021. Settlement Meeting to be held by 5/5/2021. Motions in Limine to be filed by 5/12/2021, with responses due by 5/19/2021. Plaintiffs portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 5/10/2021, Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 5/17/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 5/28/2021 at 11:00 AM in Charleston before Senior Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. Proposed Jury Charges due by 6/16/2021. Final Settlement Conference at 11:00 AM on 6/21/2021 in Charleston. Trial set for 6/22/2021 at 9:30 AM in Charleston before Senior Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. Signed by Senior Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 7/20/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca)
July 16, 2020 Filing 15 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Kroger Limited Partnership I, Lorie Parsons. (Haught Parsons, Kelsey) (Modified on 7/16/2020 to add party filer) (kew).
June 22, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY by Lorie Parsons to #11 Response In Opposition. (Auvil, Walt) (Modified on 6/23/2020 to remove links to #7 motion and #8 memorandum) (kew).
June 22, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY by Lorie Parsons to #12 Response In Opposition. (Auvil, Walt) (Modified on 6/23/2020 to remove links to #9 motion and #10 memorandum) (kew).
June 15, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE by Kroger Limited Partnership I in opposition to #9 MOTION by Lorie Parsons to Suspend the #6 Order and Notice and Stay Briefing on the #3 MOTION by Kroger Limited Partnership I to Dismiss Complaint. (Moore, Brian)
June 15, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE by Kroger Limited Partnership I in opposition to #7 MOTION by Lorie Parsons to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Wood County (Moore, Brian)
June 12, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM by Lorie Parsons in support of #9 MOTION by Lorie Parsons to Suspend the #6 Order and Notice and Stay Briefing on the #3 MOTION by Kroger Limited Partnership I to Dismiss Complaint. (Auvil, Walt)
June 12, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION by Lorie Parsons to Suspend the #6 Order and Notice and Stay Briefing on the #3 MOTION by Kroger Limited Partnership I to Dismiss Complaint. (Auvil, Walt) (Modified on 6/15/2020 to add link to #3 motion and #6 order and notice) (kew).
June 12, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM by Lorie Parsons in support of #7 MOTION by Lorie Parsons to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Wood County. (Auvil, Walt)
June 12, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION by Lorie Parsons to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Wood County (Auvil, Walt)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 7/2/2020. Rule 26(f) Meeting 7/13/2020. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 7/20/2020. Scheduling Conference at 11:00 AM on 7/31/2020 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 8/3/2020. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 8/11/2020. Signed by Senior District Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 6/12/2020. (cc: counsel of record and any unrepresented party) (slr)
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
June 10, 2020 CASE assigned to Senior District Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Kroger Limited Partnership I in support of #3 MOTION by Kroger Limited Partnership I to Dismiss Complaint. (Moore, Brian)
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION by Kroger Limited Partnership I to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Moore, Brian) (Modified on 6/11/2020 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kew).
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Kroger Limited Partnership I (Moore, Brian)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kroger Limited Partnership I with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Wood County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7640928. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (st)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parsons v. Kroger Limited Partnership I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorie Parsons
Represented By: Kirk Auvil
Represented By: Anthony Brunicardi, II
Represented By: Walt Auvil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership I
Represented By: Kelsey Haught Parsons
Represented By: Brian J. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?