Simms v. National Travel Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: Judy Simms
Defendant: National Travel Service, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00500
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER directing that the Scheduling Conference previously scheduled is canceled and the case shall proceed as follows: The amendment of any pleading and the joinder of any party shall be completed no later than 9/18/2020. The parties shall serve all discovery requests by 1/18/2021, and complete all depositions by 3/4/2021. Expert Witness List by the party bearing the burden of proof due no later than 1/4/2021, by the party not bearing the burden of proof due no later than 2/2/2021, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due no later than 2/18/2021. All dispositive motions, except those filed under Rule 12(b), shall be filed and served by 3/24/2021, with responses due by 4/7/2021, and replies due by 4/14/2021. Settlement Meeting to be held no later than 5/25/2021. All motions in limine shall be filed and served by 6/1/2021, with responses due by 6/8/2021. The plaintiff portion of the proposed integrated pretrial order shall be submitted to opposing counsel by 5/31/2021, and the proposed integrated pretrial order due for entry no later than 6/7/2021. A pretrial conference shall be held at 09:00 AM on 7/7/2021. Proposed charges to the jury due by 7/13/2021. A final settlement conference shall be held at 9:00 AM on 7/7/2021. Trial of this action shall be held at 9:00 AM on 7/20/2021 before Judge Thomas E. Johnston. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 8/25/2020. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (lca)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Travel Service, Inc. for First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Plaintiff. (Strogen, Chandler)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by National Travel Service, Inc., Judy Simms. (Strogen, Chandler) (Modified on 8/20/2020 to add party filer) (kew).
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 8/18/2020. Rule 26(f) Meeting 9/1/2020. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 9/8/2020. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 2:30 PM on 9/14/2020. Entry of Scheduling Order 9/22/2020. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 9/29/2020. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 7/28/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by National Travel Service, Inc. (Strogen, Chandler) (Modified on 7/24/2020 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kew).
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant National Travel Service, Inc. (Strogen, Chandler)
July 16, 2020 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by National Travel Service, Inc. with summons, complaint, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7677688. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (kew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simms v. National Travel Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Simms
Represented By: Hoyt E. Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Travel Service, Inc.
Represented By: Brian J. Moore
Represented By: Chandler Strogen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?