White v. Huntington National Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Steven H. White
Defendant: The Huntington National Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00539
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY by Huntington National Bank, N.A. to #11 Response In Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rice, Jill)
September 16, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE by Steven H. White in opposition to #6 MOTION by Huntington National Bank, N.A. to Dismiss Complaint (Sorrells, W.)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER directing that the Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 9/30/2020, is CANCELLED; this case shall proceed as follows: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 10/30/2020. Discovery requests to be completed by 4/2/2021, and all depositions by 5/28/2021. Deadline for disclosures required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(3)is 4/30/2021. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 3/17/2021, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 4/19/2021, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 5/3/2021. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 6/25/2021. Motions in Limine to be filed by 9/10/2021, with responses due by 9/17/2021. Proposed Voir Dire, Jury Instructions, and Verdict Form due by 10/18/2021. Plaintiff's portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 10/7/2021. Proposed integrated pretrial order due by 10/14/2021. Pretrial Conference/Final Settlement Conference set for 10/21/2021 at 11:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 11/8/2021 at 9:00 AM in Charleston before Judge Irene C. Berger. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 9/10/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (btm) (Modified on 9/14/2020 to add deadline) (ts)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Huntington National Bank, N.A., Steven H. White. (Attachment: #1 Worksheet)(Rice, Jill) (Modified on 9/9/2020 to add party filer) (kew).
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Huntington National Bank, N.A. (Rice, Jill)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Huntington National Bank, N.A. in support of #6 MOTION by Huntington National Bank, N.A. to Dismiss Complaint. (Rice, Jill)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION by Huntington National Bank, N.A. to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. B, #3 Ex. C, #4 Ex. D, #5 Ex. E, #6 Ex. F)(Rice, Jill) (Modified on 9/3/2020 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kew).
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Bradley David Dunkle on behalf of Steven H. White. (Dunkle, Bradley)
August 14, 2020 SET ANSWER DEADLINE for Huntington National Bank, N.A. to 9/2/2020. (kew)
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION re: extension of time to serve a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal to 09/02/2020 by Huntington National Bank, N.A., Steven H. White. (Rice, Jill) (Modified on 8/17/2020 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add party filer) (kew).
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 9/2/2020. Rule 26(f) Meeting 9/9/2020. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 9/16/2020. Scheduling Conference at 1:30 PM on 9/30/2020 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 10/7/2020. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 10/14/2020. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 8/14/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER FOR ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES OF CIVIL ACTIONS ASSIGNED TO JUDGE IRENE C. BERGER ENTERED NOVEMBER 12, 2019. This matter referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn for Discovery. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
August 12, 2020 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Huntington National Bank, N.A. with summons, complaint, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7703902. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (kew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Huntington National Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Huntington National Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Alex Manuel Greenberg
Represented By: Clayton Thomas Harkins
Represented By: Jill Cranston Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven H. White
Represented By: Marisa Grifka
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: W. Bradley Sorrells
Represented By: Keith J. George
Represented By: Bradley David Dunkle
Represented By: L. Dante DiTrapano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?