Eldred v. Shield Roofing and Construction, LLC
Plaintiff: Bradley Edlred and Bradley Eldred
Defendant: Shield Roofing and Construction, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00571
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Filing 16 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Shield Roofing and Construction, LLC. (Bowles, Jason)
October 16, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint With Jury Demand by Shield Roofing and Construction, LLC and COUNTERCLAIM against Bradley Eldred (Kuratomi, Nathanial) (Modiied on 10/19/2020 to add jury demand) (ts)
October 14, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Shield Roofing and Construction, LLC for Answers and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents. (Bowles, Jason)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 10/12/2020. Rule 26(f) Meeting 10/19/2020. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 10/26/2020. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 3:00 PM on 11/4/2020 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 11/9/2020. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 11/16/2020. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 9/30/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)
September 29, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason David Bowles on behalf of Shield Roofing and Construction, LLC. (Bowles, Jason)
September 29, 2020 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Shield Roofing and Construction, LLC (Kuratomi, Nathanial)
September 29, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Shield Roofing and Construction, LLC for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission, and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff. (Kuratomi, Nathanial)
September 29, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint by Shield Roofing and Construction, LLC with Jury Demand and COUNTERCLAIM by Shield Roofing and Construction, LLC against Bradley Eldred. (Kuratomi, Nathanial) (Modified on 9/30/2020 to add jury demand) (kew).
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nathanial A. Kuratomi on behalf of Shield Roofing and Construction, LLC. (Kuratomi, Nathanial)
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 9/8/2020 as to Shield Roofing and Construction, LLC. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002764125. (kew)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bradley Eldred for First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents and Things to Defendant. (Yon, Daniel)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shield Roofing and Construction, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (kew)
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Bradley Eldred for Shield Roofing and Construction, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. (Yon, Daniel)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shield Roofing and Construction, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (kew)
August 28, 2020 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7721441. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons as to Shield Roofing and Construction, LLC, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (kew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eldred v. Shield Roofing and Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shield Roofing and Construction, LLC
Represented By: Jason David Bowles
Represented By: Nathanial A. Kuratomi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Edlred
Represented By: Ralph Joseph Hagy
Represented By: Daniel T. Yon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Eldred
Represented By: Ralph Joseph Hagy
Represented By: Daniel T. Yon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?