Longanacre v. National Council on Compensation Insurance, Inc.
Plaintiff: Maureen Longanacre
Defendant: National Council on Compensation Insurance, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00587
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER directing that the scheduling conference is cancelled; this case shall proceed as follows: Amending the plaintiff's pleadings by 12/18/2020. Amending the defendant's pleadings by 1/19/2021. Discovery requests to be completed by 5/10/2021. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 4/23/2021, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 5/24/2021, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 6/8/2021. Discovery to close by 6/22/2021. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 7/12/2021, with responses due by 7/26/2021, and replies due by 8/2/2021. Settlement Meeting to be held by 9/13/2021. Motions in Limine to be filed by 9/20/2021, with responses due by 9/27/2021. Plaintiffs portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 9/16/2021. Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 9/23/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 10/8/2021 at 11:00 AM in Charleston before Senior Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. Proposed Jury Charges due by 10/25/2021. Final Settlement Conference at 10:00 AM on 11/1/2021 in Charleston. Trial set for 11/2/2021 at 9:30 AM in Charleston before Senior Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. Signed by Senior Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 10/23/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (btm)
October 21, 2020 Filing 11 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by National Council on Compensation Insurance, Inc., Maureen Longanacre (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Miller, Kameron) (Modified on 10/22/2020 to add party filer) (ts).
October 7, 2020 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant National Council on Compensation Insurance, Inc. (Miller, Kameron)
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by National Council on Compensation Insurance, Inc. (Miller, Kameron)
September 15, 2020 SET ANSWER DEADLINE for National Council on Compensation Insurance, Inc. to 9/28/2020. (kew)
September 15, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL to 9/28/2020 by National Council on Compensation Insurance, Inc., Maureen Longanacre. (Miller, Kameron) (Modified on 9/16/2020 to add party filer) (kew).
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Patrick G. DeBlasio, III on behalf of National Council on Compensation Insurance, Inc. Local counsel: Kameron T. Miller. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7736938. (Miller, Kameron)
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 EXHIBIT 3 by National Council on Compensation Insurance, Inc. re: #1 Notice of Removal (filed pursuant to Court's #4 Order). (mk)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 10/5/2020. Rule 26(f) Meeting 10/14/2020. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 10/21/2020. Scheduling Conference at 1:30 PM on 10/30/2020 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 11/4/2020. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 11/13/2020 Signed by Senior Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 9/14/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (lca)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying defendant's #3 motion to seal Exhibit 3 to the notice of removal. The Clerk is directed to maintain Exhibit 3 (Record 3-1) as a public document. Signed by Senior Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 9/14/2020. (cc: counsel of record and any unrepresented parties) (arb)
September 10, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION by National Council on Compensation Insurance, Inc. to File Under Seal Exhibit 3 in support of #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Proposed Order) (Miller, Kameron)
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
September 9, 2020 CASE assigned to Senior Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by National Council on Compensation Insurance, Inc. with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7732917. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (lca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Longanacre v. National Council on Compensation Insurance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Longanacre
Represented By: Mark A. Atkinson
Represented By: John-Mark Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Council on Compensation Insurance, Inc.
Represented By: Kameron Miller
Represented By: Patrick G. DeBlasio, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?