Workman v. Farmer et al
Plaintiff: Angela Workman
Defendant: Bryan Lanham, David Farmer and James Edward Hoffman
Case Number: 2:2020cv00588
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER directing that the Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 10/29/2020, is cancelled and the case shall proceed as follows: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 12/4/2020. Discovery requests to be completed by 4/16/2021. All discovery, including disclosures required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2), but not disclosures required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(3), shall be completed by 5/14/2021. The last date to complete depositions shall be 6/11/2021. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 2/16/2021, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 3/16/2021, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 4/6/2021. Summary Judgment and Other Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 7/9/2021. Settlement Meeting must be held at least (45) days prior to the Pretrial Conference. Mediation must be concluded at least (30) days prior to the Pretrial Conference. Within (5) days of the completion of mediation, the parties shall file a written status report with the Court confirming that mediation was held and advising as to whether the matter was settled. Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures: Counsel and unrepresented parties shall make all Rule 26(a)(3) disclosures at least (30) days prior to the Pretrial Conference. Motions in Limine to be filed by 9/10/2021, with responses due by 9/17/2021. Proposed Voir Dire, Jury Instructions, and Verdict Form due 10/18/2021. Plaintiffs portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 10/14/2021. Proposed integrated pretrial order due by 10/21/2021. Pretrial Conference/Final Settlement Conference, shall be held on 10/28/2021 at 1:30 p.m. Jury Trial set for 11/8/2021 at 9:00 AM in Charleston before Judge Irene C. Berger. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 10/16/2020. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (tmr)
October 15, 2020 Filing 5 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Bryan Lanham, Angela Workman. (Murray, William) (Modified on 10/16/2020 to add party filer) (ts).
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 10/1/2020. Rule 26(f) Meeting 10/8/2020. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 10/15/2020. Scheduling Conference at 02:00 PM on 10/29/2020 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 11/5/2020. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 11/12/2020. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 9/14/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (mk)
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER FOR ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES OF CIVIL ACTIONS ASSIGNED TO JUDGE IRENE C. BERGER ENTERED NOVEMBER 12, 2019. This matter referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn for Discovery. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
September 10, 2020 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Bryan Lanham. (Murray, William) (Modified on 9/11/2020 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add jury demand) (kew).
September 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bryan Lanham with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7733424. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (mms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Workman v. Farmer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Workman
Represented By: L. Victor Navy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Lanham
Represented By: William E. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Edward Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?