Ellis v. Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Laura D. Ellis
Defendant: Truist Financial Corporation Your Benefit Plan, Does 1 through 10 and Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00605
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of Truist Financial Corporation Your Benefit Plan Without Prejudice by Laura D. Ellis pursuant to Rule 41, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Stephens, John)
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company (Kenney, Jonathan)
October 2, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Attorney Jonathan M. Kenney on 10/02/20. Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company waiver mailed on 9/29/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Kenney, Jonathan)
October 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jonathan M. Kenney on behalf of Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Kenney, Jonathan)
October 2, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 9/28/2020 as to Truist Financial Corporation Your Benefit Plan. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002773400. (klc)
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 9/28/2020 as to Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002773394. (klc)
September 15, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
September 14, 2020 CASE assigned to Senior Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
September 14, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company, Truist Financial Corporation Your Benefit Plan, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachment: #1 Summons as to Truist Financial Corporation Your Benefit Plan) (kew)
September 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7737233. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Summons as to Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company, #4 Proposed Summons as to Truist Financial Corporation Your Benefit Plan, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (kew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis v. Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truist Financial Corporation Your Benefit Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan M. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura D. Ellis
Represented By: John Patrick L. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?