Marietta Area Healthcare, Inc. et al v. King et al
Plaintiff: Marietta Area Healthcare, Inc., Marietta Memorial Hospital and Marietta Healthcare Physicians, Inc.
Defendant: Michael A. King and Michael D. Roberts, M.D.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00639
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Michael A. King on 10/13/2020. Michael A. King waiver mailed on 10/9/2020, answer due 12/8/2020. (Gottlieb, Max)
November 2, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Michael D. Roberts on 10/12/2020. Michael D. Roberts, M.D. waiver mailed on 10/9/2020, answer due 12/8/2020. (Gottlieb, Max)
October 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF LAWSUIT AND REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS (Form 1A) by Marietta Healthcare Physicians, Inc., Marietta Area Healthcare, Inc., Marietta Memorial Hospital for Dr. Michael A. King, Michael D. Roberts, M.D., with proposed WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FORM (Form 1B). (Hissam, Michael)
September 29, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #6 Standing Order. ERROR: Incorrect Standing Order entered. CORRECTION: Image removed at ECF #6 and correct Standing Order entered at ECF #7. (ts)
September 29, 2020 Filing 7 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER FOR ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES OF CIVIL ACTIONS ASSIGNED TO JUDGE IRENE C. BERGER ENTERED NOVEMBER 12, 2019. This matter referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn for Discovery. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 INCORRECT ENTRY; IMAGE REMOVED. (Modified on 9/29/2020 to remove image; see entry #7 for Standing Order) (ts).
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael A. King and Michael D. Roberts, M.D., re: #4 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Michael D. Roberts, M.D.) (mms)
September 25, 2020 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7749541. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Summons as to Michael A. King, #3 Proposed Summons as to Michael D. Roberts, M.D. #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (mms)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiff Marietta Memorial Hospital. (Hissam, Michael) (Modified on 9/28/2020 to correct party filer) (kew).
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiff Marietta Healthcare Physicians, Inc. (Hissam, Michael) (Modified on 9/28/2020 to correct party filer) (kew).
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiff Marietta Area Healthcare, Inc. (Hissam, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marietta Area Healthcare, Inc. et al v. King et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D. Roberts, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marietta Area Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Michael B. Hissam
Represented By: Max C. Gottlieb
Represented By: Isaac Ralston Forman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marietta Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Michael B. Hissam
Represented By: Max C. Gottlieb
Represented By: Isaac Ralston Forman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marietta Healthcare Physicians, Inc.
Represented By: Michael B. Hissam
Represented By: Max C. Gottlieb
Represented By: Isaac Ralston Forman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?