Saddoris v. Kanawha River Railroad, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Darrell Saddoris
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company and Kanawha River Railroad, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00646
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kanawha River Railroad, L.L.C., Norfolk Southern Railway Company for First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents Directed to Plaintiff. (Brennan, Julie)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER directing that the Scheduling Conference previously scheduled is cancelled and the case shall proceed as follows: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 1/29/2021. Discovery requests to be completed by 6/11/2021, and all depositions by 7/23/2021. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 5/14/2021, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 6/11/2021, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 6/25/2021. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 8/13/2021. Motions in Limine to be filed by 9/10/2021, with responses due by 9/17/2021. Plaintiffs portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 10/7/2021. Proposed integrated pretrial order due by 10/14/2021. Proposed Jury Charges due by 10/18/2021. A combined Pretrial Conference/Settlement Conference shall be held on 10/21/2021 at 11:00 am. Jury Trial set for 11/8/2021 at 9:00 AM in Charleston before Judge Irene C. Berger. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 10/27/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca)
October 27, 2020 Filing 5 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Kanawha River Railroad, L.L.C., Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Darrell Saddoris. (Brennan, Julie) (Modified on 10/28/2020 to add party filer) (ts).
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Kanawha River Railroad, L.L.C., Norfolk Southern Railway Company.(Brennan, Julie)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 10/16/2020. Rule 26(f) Meeting 10/20/2020. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 10/27/2020. Scheduling Conference at 2:00 PM on 11/10/2020. Entry of Scheduling Order 11/17/2020. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 11/24/2020. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 10/2/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER FOR ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES OF CIVIL ACTIONS ASSIGNED TO JUDGE IRENE C. BERGER ENTERED NOVEMBER 12, 2019. This matter referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn for Discovery. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
September 25, 2020 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Kanawha River Railroad, L.L.C. with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7749503. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saddoris v. Kanawha River Railroad, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Julie Brennan
Represented By: Timothy R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kanawha River Railroad, L.L.C.
Represented By: Julie Brennan
Represented By: Timothy R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Saddoris
Represented By: J. Kristofer Cormany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?