Gillispie v. EGS Financial Care, Inc.
Plaintiff: Christine Gillispie
Defendant: EGS Financial Care, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00692
Filed: October 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joseph R Goodwin
Referring Judge: Dwane L Tinsley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2020 CONSENT TO JURISDICTION OF U. S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley pursuant to #6 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting; Case Referred Flag raised. (ts)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER Because the parties consented to proceed before the Magistrate Judge in the #6 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting the scheduling conference previously scheduled for 12/14/2020 is CANCELLED and directing this case to proceed as follows: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 1/29/2021. Discovery requests to be completed by 4/15/2021, and all depositions by 6/1/2021, the discovery completion date. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 2/1/2021, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 2/15/2021, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 3/1/2021. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 6/22/2021, with responses due by 7/6/2021, and replies due by 7/13/2021. Settlement Meeting and Pretrial Disclosures to take place by 5/24/2021. Mediation deadline is 5/24/2021. Motions in Limine due by 9/13/2021, with responses due by 9/20/2021. Plaintiff's portion of the Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due to defendant by 8/6/2021. Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 8/20/2021. Pretrial Conference and Final Settlement Conference set for 9/27/2021 at 11:00 AM in Charleston before Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. Proposed Jury Charge due by 8/20/2021. Jury Trial set for 11/2/2021 at 09:00 AM in Charleston before Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 12/2/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (arb)
December 1, 2020 Filing 6 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by EGS Financial Care, Inc., Christina Gillispie. (Presley, Marla) (Modified on 12/2/2020 to add party filer) (ts).
November 18, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by EGS Financial Care, Inc. (Presley, Marla)
October 23, 2020 RESET ANSWER DEADLINE as to EGS Financial Care, Inc. for 11/18/2020 pursuant to #4 Stipulation. (ts)
October 23, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME for Defendant to Respond to Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal to November 18, 2020 by EGS Financial Care, Inc., Christine Gillispie (Presley, Marla) (Modified on 10/26/2020 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add party filer) (ts).
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions due by 11/11/2020. Last day for Rule 26(f) Meeting is 11/23/2020. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting is 11/30/2020. Scheduling Conference at 09:30 AM on 12/14/2020 in Charleston before Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. Entry of Scheduling Order by 12/21/2020. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures is 12/28/2020. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/21/2020. (cc: counsel of record and any unrepresented parties) (arb)
October 20, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
October 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by EGS Financial Care, Inc. with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7775317. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (lca)
October 19, 2020 CASE assigned to Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. (klc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gillispie v. EGS Financial Care, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Gillispie
Represented By: Paul L. Frampton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EGS Financial Care, Inc.
Represented By: Marla N. Presley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?