Chestnut v. CDM Smith, Inc.
Plaintiff: Angela Chestnut
Defendant: CDM Smith, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00742
Filed: November 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER directing that the Scheduling Conference is CANCELED and that this case shall proceed as follows: The amendment of any pleading and the joinder of any party shall be completed no later than 1/18/2021. The parties shall serve all discovery requests by 1/18/2021, and complete all depositions by 12/21/2021. Expert Witness List by the party bearing the burden of proof due no later than 1/18/2021, by the party not bearing the burden of proof due no later than 9/17/2021, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due no later than 10/15/2021. All dispositive motions, except those filed under Rule 12(b), shall be filed and served by 1/10/2022, with responses due by 1/24/2022, and replies due by 1/31/2022. Settlement Meeting to be held no later than 3/14/2022. All motions in limine shall be filed and served by 3/21/2022, with responses due by 3/28/2022. The plaintiff portion of the proposed integrated pretrial order shall be submitted to opposing counsel by 3/17/2022, and the proposed integrated pretrial order due for entry no later than 3/24/2022. A pretrial conference shall be held at 9:00 AM on 4/21/2022. Proposed charges to the jury due by 4/26/2022. A final settlement conference shall be held at 9:00 AM on 4/21/2022. Trial of this action shall be held at 9:00 AM on 5/3/2022 before Judge Thomas E. Johnston. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 12/30/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)
December 28, 2020 Filing 6 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by CDM Smith, Inc., Angela Chestnut. (Capito, Katherine) (Modified on 12/29/2020 to add party filer) (kew).
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 12/7/2020. Rule 26(f) Meeting 12/21/2020. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 12/28/2020. Scheduling Conference at 03:00 PM on 1/4/2021 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 1/8/2021. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 1/18/2021. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 11/16/2020. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (tmr)
November 16, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CDM Smith, Inc. (Capito, Katherine)
November 13, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
November 12, 2020 CASE assigned to Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
November 12, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant CDM Smith, Inc. (Capito, Katherine)
November 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CDM Smith, Inc. with summons, complaint, docket sheet from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7799175. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (kew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chestnut v. CDM Smith, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDM Smith, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine B. Capito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Chestnut
Represented By: Paul L. Frampton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?