Estep v. Special Touch Nursing Service, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Shawna Estep
Defendant: A Special Touch In Home Care, LLC and Special Touch Nursing Service, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00788
Filed: December 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Johnnie E. Brown's Representation of A Special Touch in Home Care, LLC by Special Touch in Home Care, LLC (Brown, Johnnie) (Modified on 1/10/2021 to correct party filer) (ts).
December 31, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard M. Wallace, Kameron T. Miller on behalf of A Special Touch In Home Care, LLC. (Wallace, Richard)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 1/19/2021. Rule 26(f) Meeting 2/2/2021. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 2/9/2021. Scheduling Conference at 03:30 PM on 2/16/2021 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 2/23/2021. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 3/2/2021. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 12/28/2020. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (tmr)
December 22, 2020 RESET ANSWER DEADLINE as to A Special Touch In Home Care, LLC and Special Touch Nursing Service, Inc. for 2/3/2021 pursuant to #6 Stipulation. (ts)
December 22, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION by A Special Touch In Home Care, LLC, Special Touch Nursing Service, Inc., Shawna Estep to Extend Deadline to File Answer to #1 Complaint (Brown, Johnnie) (Modified on 12/23/2020 to add link to #1 complaint and to add party filer) (ts).
December 21, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 12/10/2020 as to Special Touch Nursing Service, Inc.. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002967403. (lca)
December 21, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 12/10/2020 as to A Special Touch In Home Care, LLC. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002967397. (lca)
December 7, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
December 7, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to A Special Touch In Home Care, LLC, Special Touch Nursing Service, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachment: #1 Summons for Special Touch Nursing Service, Inc.) (lca)
December 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7816721. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons for A Special Touch In Home Care, LLC, #2 Proposed Summons for Special Touch Nursing Service, Inc., #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (lca)
December 2, 2020 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estep v. Special Touch Nursing Service, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Special Touch In Home Care, LLC
Represented By: Johnnie E. Brown
Represented By: Kameron Miller
Represented By: Richard M. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Special Touch Nursing Service, Inc.
Represented By: Johnnie E. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawna Estep
Represented By: J. Michael Ranson
Represented By: G. Patrick Jacobs
Represented By: Cynthia M. Ranson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?