Subpoena Duces Tecum Issued to Gene W. Bailey, II, Esq.
Interested Party: BrickStreet Mutual Insurance Company
In Re: Subpoena Duces Tecum Issued to Gene W. Bailey, II, Esq.
Case Number: 2:2020mc00129
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing that the Plaintiff's #1 Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum Served Upon Gene Bailey, Esq. by Defendant BrickStreet be TRANSFERRED to the Western District of Virginia, in relation to Southern Coal Corp. v. BrickStreet Mutual Ins. Co.; the Clerk is directed to TRANSFER this matter to the Western District of Virginia and REMOVE it from the docket of this Court. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 8/20/2020. (cc: Clerk of the District Court for the Western District of Virginia; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE by Subpoena Duces Tecum Issued to Gene W. Bailey, II, Esq. to the Court's #2 Order. (Franks, Raymond)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 RESPONSE by BrickStreet Mutual Insurance Company to the Court's #2 Order. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1) (Barebo, Ashley)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: directing that the parties file briefing no later than 8/19/2020, re: Plaintiff's #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum Served Upon Gene Bailey, Esq. By Defendant Brickstreet, addressing whether this matter should be transferred to the Western District of Virginia as the issuing court, pursuant to Rule 45(f); any response to Plaintiff's #1 motion, as well as any evidentiary exhibits shall be filed no later than 8/24/2020; directing counsel for Plaintiff to ensure that this Order is served upon counsel for Brickstreet Mutual Insurance Company, as an Interested party. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 8/14/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (msa)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum Served Upon Gene Bailey, Esq. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ts)
August 13, 2020 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (ts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Subpoena Duces Tecum Issued to Gene W. Bailey, II, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: BrickStreet Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert L. Massie
Represented By: Ashley N. Barebo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Subpoena Duces Tecum Issued to Gene W. Bailey, II, Esq.
Represented By: Raymond S. Franks, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?