Deere Credit Services, Inc. v. Davis Contracting & Excavating LLC et al
Plaintiff: Deere Credit Services, Inc.
Defendant: Joshua S. Davis and Davis Contracting & Excavating LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00046
Filed: January 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joseph R Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 Complaint and #2 Electronic Summons Issued. ERROR: Incomplete images attached. CORRECTION: Images replaced with completed images. (ts)
January 20, 2021 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
January 19, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Davis Contracting & Excavating LLC and Joshua S. Davis re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Joshua S. Davis) (mms) (Modified on 1/21/2021 to replace unsigned images)(ts).
January 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7855714. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C, #2 Exhibits D-H, #3 Proposed Summons as to Davis Contracting & Excavating LLC, #4 Proposed Summons as to Joshua S. Davis, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (mms) (Attachment 5 replaced on 1/19/2021) (ts).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deere Credit Services, Inc. v. Davis Contracting & Excavating LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deere Credit Services, Inc.
Represented By: W. Bradley Sorrells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua S. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis Contracting & Excavating LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?