Fujita v. Charleston Kanawha Housing Authority
Plaintiff: Dawn Fujita
Defendant: Charleston Kanawha Housing Authority
Case Number: 2:2021cv00087
Filed: February 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER The Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 3/24/2021 is CANCELLED and this case proceed as follows: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 4/15/2021. Discovery requests to be completed by 12/1/2021. All Discovery to be completed by 12/23/2021. All depositions completed by 1/14/2022. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 9/1/2021, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 10/1/2021, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 10/29/2021. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 2/4/2022. The Settlement Meeting must be held at least forty-five (45) days prior to the Pretrial Conference. The mediation must be concluded at least thirty (30) days prior to the Pretrial Conference. Within five (5) days of the completion of mediation, the parties shall file a written status report with the Court. Pretrial Conference/Settlement Conference to be held by 5/5/2022 at 1:30 p.m. Deadline for Rule 26(a)(3) disclosures at least thirty (30) days prior to the Pretrial Conference. Motions in Limine to be filed by 3/25/2022, with responses due by 4/1/2022. Plaintiffs portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 4/21/2022. Proposed integrated pretrial order due by 4/28/2022. Proposed Jury Charges due by 4/25/2022. Jury Trial set for 5/16/2022 at 9:00 AM before Judge Irene C. Berger. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 3/10/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts)
March 10, 2021 Filing 5 JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Charleston Kanawha Housing Authority, Dawn Fujita (Fox, Jan) (Modified on 3/11/2021 to add party filer) (ts).
February 8, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Charleston Kanawha Housing Authority.(Fox, Jan)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 2/24/2021. Rule 26(f) Meeting 3/3/2021. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 3/10/2021. Scheduling Conference at 02:00 PM on 3/24/2021 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 3/31/2021. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 4/7/2021 Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 2/5/2021. (cc:counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca)
February 4, 2021 Filing 2 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER FOR ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES OF CIVIL ACTIONS ASSIGNED TO JUDGE IRENE C. BERGER ENTERED NOVEMBER 12, 2019. This matter referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn for Discovery. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
February 3, 2021 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
February 3, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Charleston Kanawha Housing Authority with summons, complaint, amended complaint, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7870144. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (kew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fujita v. Charleston Kanawha Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charleston Kanawha Housing Authority
Represented By: Mark C. Dean
Represented By: Jan L. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Fujita
Represented By: John W. Alderman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?