Livingston et al v. American Electric Power
Plaintiff: Ronald Livingston and Carrie Livingston
Defendant: American Electric Power
Case Number: 2:2021cv00182
Filed: March 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing that the scheduling conference is cancelled and that this case shall proceed as follows: Plaintiffs' joining parties - 6/11/2021. Defendant's joining parties - 7/9/2021. Plaintiffs amending the pleadings - 7/25/2021. Defendants amended the pleadings - 7/23/20221. Last date to serve discovery requests - 1/4/2022. Opening Rule 26 expert disclosures - 12/20/2021. Responsive Rule 26 expert disclosures - 1/19/2022. Rebuttal Rule 26 expert disclosure - 2/4/2022. Discovery to close - 2/18/2022. Dispositive motions deadline - 3/10/2022. Response to dispositive motion - 3/24/2022. Reply to response to dispositive motion - 3/31/2022. Settlement Meeting - 5/11/2022. Motion in limine deadline - 5/18/2022. Responses for motions in limine - 5/25/2022. Proposed pretrial order to defendant - 5/16/2022. Integrated pretrial order - 5/23/2022. Pretrial Conference on 6/3/2022 at 11:00 AM. Proposed jury charge - 6/22/2022. Final settlement conference on 6/27/2022 at 11:00 AM. Trial on 6/28/2022 at 9:30 AM. All proceedings shall be held by the court at the Robert C. Byrd United States Courthouse, Charleston, West Virginia. Signed by Senior Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 5/6/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (kew)
May 5, 2021 Filing 5 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by American Electric Power, Ronald Livingston, Carrie Livingston. (Sorrells, W.) (Modified on 5/7/2021 to add party filers) (kew).
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE: Motions under F.R. Civ. P. 12(b) - 4/19/2021. Last day for Rule 26(f) Meeting - 4/28/2021. Last day to file Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - 5/5/2021. Scheduling Conference at 1:30 p.m., on 5/14/2021 at the Robert C. Byrd United States Courthouse in Charleston, before the undersigned, unless canceled. Entry of Scheduling Order - 5/19/2021. Last day to serve F.R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) disclosures - 5/28/2021. Signed by Senior Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 3/29/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (lca)
March 26, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Electric Power. (Sorrells, W.) (Modified on 3/26/2021 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kew).
March 23, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re: #1 Complaint by American Electric Power (Sorrells, W.) (Modified on 3/23/2021 to add link to #1 complaint) (ts).
March 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Electric Power with summons, complaint, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Jackson County. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7908725. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (kew)
March 22, 2021 CASE assigned to Senior Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Livingston et al v. American Electric Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Livingston
Represented By: Nicolas Todd Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Livingston
Represented By: Nicolas Todd Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Electric Power
Represented By: W. Bradley Sorrells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?