Friendly Hempsters LLC v. Fleur De Leaf Kentucky et al
Plaintiff: Friendly Hempsters LLC
Defendant: Alexander Jacob Miller, John Liter, Dave Wicking, A. J. Miller and Fleur De Leaf Kentucky
Case Number: 2:2021cv00187
Filed: March 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joseph R Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 MOTION to Extend Deadlines; directing that the period for limited discovery is extended until 7/15/2021; thereafter the parties shall individually submit supplemental briefing by 7/30/2021. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/21/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca)
May 21, 2021 Filing 21 JOINT MOTION by Fleur De Leaf Kentucky, Friendly Hempsters, LLC to Extend Deadlines re: #15 Order (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Hendrickson, David) (Modified on 5/21/2021 to add link to #15 order) (ts).
May 5, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Friendly Hempsters LLC of Alexander Jacob A.J. Miller on May 25, 2021 at the conclusion of the deposition of Dave Wicking (Ferrell, Pamela)
May 5, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Friendly Hempsters LLC of Dave Wicking on May 25, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. (Ferrell, Pamela)
May 5, 2021 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John Liter, re: #1 Complaint attached to Notice of Removal. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (lca)
May 5, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Friendly Hempsters LLC for John Liter (Ferrell, Pamela)
April 30, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Friendly Hempsters LLC for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production and Requests for Admission to Defendants Fleur De Leaf Kentucky, A. J. Miller, and Dave Wicking. (Ferrell, Pamela)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 MOTION to File Surreply; directing and granting the parties 30 days for limited discovery; limited discovery is to conclude on 5/30/2021; parties shall individually submit supplemental briefing no later than 6/14/2021; The #8 Order And Notice previously filed in this case is VACATED. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/30/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (tmr)
April 28, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION by Friendly Hempsters LLC for Leave to File Surreply to Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss and Alternative Motion to Transfer of Fleur De Leaf Kentucky, LLC with proposed document attached (Attachment: #1 Surreply)(Ferrell, Pamela)
April 21, 2021 Filing 13 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fleur De Leaf Kentucky for Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion To Dismiss and Alternative Motion to Transer. (Hendrickson, David)
April 21, 2021 Filing 12 REPLY MEMORANDUM by Alexander Jacob Miller, Dave Wicking to #10 Response In Opposition. (Hendrickson, David) (Modified on 4/21/2021 to remove link to #6 motion and #7 memorandum) (ts).
April 21, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY MEMORANDUM by Fleur De Leaf Kentucky to #9 Response in Opposition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K, #2 Exhibit L, #3 Exhibit M)(Hendrickson, David) (Modified on 4/21/2021 to correct link to #9 response) (ts)
April 14, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE by Friendly Hempsters LLC in opposition to #6 MOTION by Fleur De Leaf Kentucky to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal and Alternative MOTION to Transfer. (Ferrell, Pamela)
April 14, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE by Friendly Hempsters LLC in opposition to #4 MOTION by Fleur De Leaf Kentucky to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal and Alternative MOTION to Transfer. (Ferrell, Pamela)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 VACATED PURSUANT TO #15 ORDER ENTERED 4/30/2021: ORDER AND NOTICE Motions under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) - 4/22/2021. Last day for Rule 26(f) meeting - 5/5/2021. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) meeting - 5/12/2021. Scheduling Conference at 9:00 a.m., on 5/26/2021 at the Robert C. Byrd United States Courthouse, 300 Virginia Street East, Room 6610 (Library/Conference Room), Charleston, WV. Entry of scheduling order - 5/31/2021. Last day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures - 6/7/2021. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/1/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (lca) (Modified on 5/17/2021 to note the order has been vacated) (ts).
March 31, 2021 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Alexander Jacob Miller, Dave Wicking in support of #6 MOTION by Fleur De Leaf Kentucky to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal and Alternative MOTION to Transfer. (Hendrickson, David)
March 31, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION by Fleur De Leaf Kentucky to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal and Alternative MOTION to Transfer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit)(Hendrickson, David) (Modified on 3/31/2021 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add second event) (ts).
March 31, 2021 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Fleur De Leaf Kentucky in support of #4 MOTION by Fleur De Leaf Kentucky to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal and Alternative MOTION to Transfer .(Hendrickson, David)
March 31, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION by Fleur De Leaf Kentucky to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal and Alternative MOTION to Transfer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Hendrickson, David) (Modified on 3/31/2021 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add second motion event) (ts).
March 29, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET re: #1 Notice of Removal by Fleur De Leaf Kentucky (Hendrickson, David) (Modified on 3/29/2021 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (ts)
March 26, 2021 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
March 25, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dave Wicking, Alexander Jacob Miller, Fleur De Leaf Kentucky, John Liter with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Wood County. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7910952. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (ts)
March 25, 2021 CASE assigned to Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. (klc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friendly Hempsters LLC v. Fleur De Leaf Kentucky et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Jacob Miller
Represented By: David K. Hendrickson
Represented By: Barbara Allen Samples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Liter
Represented By: David K. Hendrickson
Represented By: Barbara Allen Samples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Wicking
Represented By: David K. Hendrickson
Represented By: Barbara Allen Samples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. J. Miller
Represented By: David K. Hendrickson
Represented By: Barbara Allen Samples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fleur De Leaf Kentucky
Represented By: David K. Hendrickson
Represented By: Barbara Allen Samples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friendly Hempsters LLC
Represented By: Pamela J. Ferrell
Represented By: Floyd M. Sayre, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?