Turner v. Syngenta Crop Protection LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Turner
Defendant: Syngenta AG, Chevron U.S.A., Inc., Syngenta Crop Protection LLC and Chevron U.S.A. Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00211
Filed: April 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 JOINT STIPULATION AND MOTION by Syngenta AG, Syngenta Crop Protection LLC, Kenneth Turner to Stay Pending MDL Transfer; directing all proceedings in this case are STAYED until thirty days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation determines whether to transfer this action. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 4/30/2021. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kew)
April 29, 2021 Filing 12 JOINT STIPULATION AND MOTION by Syngenta AG, Syngenta Crop Protection LLC, Kenneth Turner to Stay Pending MDL Transfer (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Weaver, Kurt) (Modified on 4/29/2021 to add party filer) (ts).
April 29, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME for Chevron U.S.A., Inc., Kenneth Turner to Respond to the #1 Complaint (Warner, Robert) (Modified on 4/29/2021 to correct link to #1 complaint) (ts).
April 29, 2021 RESET ANSWER DEADLINE as to Chevron U.S.A. Inc. for 6/17/2021 pursuant to #11 Stipulation. (ts)
April 23, 2021 Filing 10 COPY OF NOTICE OF RELATED ACTIONS In re: Paraquat Product Liability Litigation, MDL No. 3004. (ts)
April 22, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Syngenta Crop Protection LLC. Syngenta Crop Protection LLC served on 4/14/2021, answer due 5/5/2021. Summons served on Facility Manager, Terry Long. (Warner, Robert)
April 14, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Chevron U.S.A. Inc. Chevron U.S.A. Inc. served on 4/7/2021, answer due 4/28/2021. Summons served on Registered Agent, Corporation Service Company, Authorized Agent, Susie Vang. (Warner, Robert)
April 13, 2021 Filing 7 ADDITIONAL EXHIBITS by Kenneth Turner in support of #5 Notice of Pending Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7, #7 Envelope) (ts) (Modified on 4/15/2021 to replace attachment #5 to include missing pages)(ts).
April 13, 2021 Filing 6 EXHIBITS by Kenneth Turner in support of #5 Notice of Pending Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7) (originally delivered to the Clerk's Office 4/08/2021) (ts) (Modified on 4/15/2021 to rotate image on page) (ts).
April 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF PENDING MOTION TO TRANSFER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1407 by Kenneth Turner (Warner, Robert)
April 8, 2021 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Patrick Allen Luff on behalf of Kenneth Turner. Local counsel: Robert B. Warner. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7920488. (Warner, Robert)
April 7, 2021 Filing 3 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER FOR ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES OF CIVIL ACTIONS ASSIGNED TO JUDGE IRENE C. BERGER ENTERED NOVEMBER 12, 2019. This matter referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn for Discovery. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
April 6, 2021 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
April 6, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chevron U.S.A., Inc., Syngenta AG, Syngenta Crop Protection LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Syngenta AG, #2 Summons as to Chevron U.S.A., Inc.) (kew)
April 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7918514. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons as to Syngenta AG, #2 Proposed Summons as to Syngenta Crop Protection LLC, #3 Proposed Summons as to Chevron U.S.A., Inc., #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (kew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Syngenta Crop Protection LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syngenta AG
Represented By: Kurt Douglas Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syngenta Crop Protection LLC
Represented By: Kurt Douglas Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U.S.A. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Turner
Represented By: Robert B. Warner
Represented By: Patrick Allen Luff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?