CCATT LLC et al v. White et al
Plaintiff: NCWPCS MPL 32 - Year Sites Tower Holdings LLC and CCATT LLC
Defendant: Melissa D. White and Benjamin F. White
Case Number: 2:2021cv00254
Filed: April 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER directing that the Scheduling Conference is CANCELED and that this case shall proceed as follows: Amending the pleadings or joining parties - 7/11/2021. Last date to serve discovery requests - 9/17/2021. Opening Rule 26 expert disclosures - 9/1/2021. Responsive Rule 26 expert disclosures - 10/1/2021. Rebuttal Rule 26 expert disclosure - 10/22/2021. Discovery to close - 11/1/2021. Dispositive motions deadline - 11/22/2021. Response to dispositive motion - 12/6/2021. Reply to response to dispositive motion - 12/13/2021. Settlement meeting - 1/24/2022. Motion in limine deadline - 1/31/2022. Responses for motions in limine - 2/7/2022. Proposed pretrial order to defendant - 1/26/2022. Integrated pretrial order - 2/2/2022. Pretrial Conference on 3/3/2022 at 1:30 PM. Proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law - 3/8/2022. Bench Trial on 3/15/2022 at 9:00 AM before the undersigned. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 6/9/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)
June 8, 2021 Filing 18 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by CCATT LLC, NCWPCS MPL 32 - Year Sites Tower Holdings LLC, Benjamin F. White, Melissa D. White. (Burns, John) (Modified on 6/9/2021 to add party filers) (kew).
May 5, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Elliot G. Hicks updating name and/or firm information. (kew)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER AND NOTICE: Motions under FR Civ P 12(b) - 5/24/2021. Last day for Rule 26(f) meeting - 6/1/2021. Last day to file Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - 6/7/2021. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 2:30 PM on 6/11/2021, before the undersigned, unless canceled. Entry of Scheduling Order - 6/16/2021. Last day to serve FR Civ P 26(a)(1) disclosures - 6/25/2021. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 4/30/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)
April 29, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Melissa D. White. Melissa D. White served on 4/25/2021, answer due 5/15/2021. Summons served on Melissa D. White. (Burns, John) (Modified on 5/3/2021 to update answer date)(ts).
April 29, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Benjamin F. White. Benjamin F. White served on 4/22/2021, answer due 5/13/2021. Summons served on Melissa D. White. (Burns, John)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRELIMINARY CONSENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 4/29/2021. (cc: counsel of record) (mk)
April 29, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION HEARING held by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 4/29/2021 re: #5 MOTION by CCATT LLC, NCWPCS MPL 32 - Year Sites Tower Holdings LLC for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Regarding Preliminary Injunction Court Reporter: Ayme Cochran. (slw)
April 27, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CCATT LLC for Court's Order and Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Burns, John)
April 21, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by John William Burns updating name and/or firm information on behalf of CCATT LLC. (Burns, John)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing that an in person hearing on Plaintiffs' #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order will be held on 4/29/2021 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 4/20/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)
April 19, 2021 Filing 8 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
April 19, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATION by John W. Burns, on behalf of CCATT LLC, NCWPCS MPL 32 - Year Sites Tower Holdings LLC in support of #5 MOTION by CCATT LLC, NCWPCS MPL 32 - Year Sites Tower Holdings LLC for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Regarding Preliminary Injunction (Burns, John)
April 19, 2021 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by CCATT LLC, NCWPCS MPL 32 - Year Sites Tower Holdings LLC in support of #5 MOTION by CCATT LLC, NCWPCS MPL 32 - Year Sites Tower Holdings LLC for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Regarding Preliminary Injunction (Burns, John)
April 19, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION by CCATT LLC, NCWPCS MPL 32 - Year Sites Tower Holdings LLC for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Regarding Preliminary Injunction (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Burns, John)
April 19, 2021 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiff NCWPCS MPL 32 - Year Sites Tower Holdings LLC (Burns, John)
April 19, 2021 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiff CCATT LLC (Burns, John)
April 19, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Benjamin F. White, Melissa D. White, re: #1 Complaint,. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachment: #1 Proposed Summons as to Benjamin F. White) (kew)
April 19, 2021 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7927610. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Summons as to Melissa D. White, #6 Proposed Summons as to Benjamin F. White, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (kew)
April 19, 2021 CASE assigned to Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CCATT LLC et al v. White et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa D. White
Represented By: Elliot G. Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin F. White
Represented By: Elliot G. Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NCWPCS MPL 32 - Year Sites Tower Holdings LLC
Represented By: John William Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CCATT LLC
Represented By: John William Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?