Saunders v. Clifford et al
Plaintiff: Quauntel Saunders
Defendant: Lt. Wilson, Srg. Wilson, Asst. Frame, Capt. Clifford, Srg. Pete, Warden Ames and Capt. Toney
Case Number: 2:2021cv00299
Filed: May 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Omar J Aboulhosn
Referring Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: All discovery shall be completed by 11/8/2021. Dispositive Motions (Rule 56) shall be filed by 12/8/2021. Responses to dispositive motions shall be filed by 1/10/2022. Replies to dispositive motions shall be filed by 1/24/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 7/7/2021. (cc: Plaintiff, pro se and counsel of record) (msa)
July 6, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER TO #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ames, Wilson. (Murray, William)
June 25, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER TO #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Clifford, Frame, Toney, Wilson. (Murray, William) (Modified on 6/25/2021 to add jury demand) (kew).
June 8, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #13 Letter. ERROR: Letter filed in incorrect civil action. CORRECTION: Letter removed. (kew)
June 8, 2021 Filing 13 INCORRECT ENTRY; IMAGE REMOVED. (Modified on 6/8/2021 to remove image filed in incorrect civil action) (kew).
June 8, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk via Certified Mail, Return Receipt, Restricted Delivery on behalf of Quauntel Saunders for Ames, Clifford, Frame, Pete, Toney, Wilson, re: #2 Complaint, returnable 21 days. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Return Receipt Issued as to Capt. Clifford, #2 Summons and Return Receipt Issued as to Asst. Frame, #3 Summons and Return Receipt Issued as to Srg. Pete, #4 Summons and Return Receipt Issued as to Capt. Toney, #5 Summons and Return Receipt Issued as to Lt. Wilson, #6 Summons and Return Receipt Issued as to Srg. Wilson) (kew)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER directing the Clerk to issue process in this case by preparing and serving a Summons and a copy of Plaintiff's #2 Complaint upon each Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 6/8/2021. (cc: Plaintiff) (kew)
June 4, 2021 Filing 10 LETTER to Quauntel Saunders, from Rory L. Perry II dated 6/4/2021, re: #9 letter regarding filing fee and service. (klc)
June 3, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER from Quantel Saunders re: filing fee and service. (lca)
June 3, 2021 Filing 8 Filing Fee: $402.00, Receipt Number CHAR019096. (lca)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #1 APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs; directing that plaintiff pay the filing and administrative fee of $402.00 to the Clerk by 6/21/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 5/19/2021. (cc: Plaintiff) (lca)
May 18, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #5 Standing Order. ERROR: Incorrect image attached. CORRECTION: Image removed. (ts)
May 18, 2021 Filing 6 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER FOR ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES OF CIVIL ACTIONS ASSIGNED TO JUDGE IRENE C. BERGER ENTERED NOVEMBER 12, 2019. This matter referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn for Proposed Findings & Recommendations. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (ts)
May 14, 2021 Filing 5 INCORRECT ENTRY; IMAGE REMOVED. (Modified on 5/18/2021 to remove image incorrectly docketed) (ts).
May 14, 2021 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
May 14, 2021 Filing 4 CONSENT TO COLLECTION OF FEES FROM TRUST ACCOUNT by Quauntel Saunders. (kew)
May 14, 2021 Filing 3 AUTHORIZATION TO RELEASE INSTITUTIONAL ACCOUNT INFORMATION by Quauntel Saunders. (kew)
May 14, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-O, #2 Envelope) (kew)
May 14, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION by Quauntel Saunders to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. (Attachments: #1 Resident Transaction Details, #2 Resident Statement) (kew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saunders v. Clifford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Wilson
Represented By: Mark Jeffrey McGhee
Represented By: William E. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Srg. Wilson
Represented By: Mark Jeffrey McGhee
Represented By: William E. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asst. Frame
Represented By: Mark Jeffrey McGhee
Represented By: William E. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. Clifford
Represented By: Mark Jeffrey McGhee
Represented By: William E. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Srg. Pete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Ames
Represented By: Mark Jeffrey McGhee
Represented By: William E. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. Toney
Represented By: Mark Jeffrey McGhee
Represented By: William E. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quauntel Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?