Jarvis et al v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Wanda Kingsland, Sharon Dyess, Susan Gentile, Michael Gerow, Beverley Jarvis, Karla Henry, Willie James Walker, Robert Fix, Anne Ware and Joyce Mock
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc., Does 1 through 100 Inclusive, McKesson Corporation and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00359
Filed: June 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 DISMISSAL ORDER directing that this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; the Clerk is directed to remove this case from this Court's docket. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 6/29/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)
June 28, 2021 Filing 31 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Without Prejudice by Sharon Dyess, C. R. Bard, Inc., Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. (Schulte, Steven) (Modified on 6/29/2021 to correct party filers) (ts).
June 27, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL by Melissa Dorman Matthews, Jessica Junek, Jordan E. Jarreau on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Davis, Megan) (Modified on 6/27/2021 to add party filer) (kew).
June 27, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Megan Basham Davis, Melissa Foster Bird on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Davis, Megan) (Modified on 6/27/2021 to add party filer) (kew).
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER AND NOTICE: Motions under FR Civ P 12(b) - 7/14/2021. Last day for Rule 26(f) meeting - 7/28/2021. Last day to file Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - 8/4/2021. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 3:00 p.m. on 8/11/2021, before the undersigned, unless canceled. Entry of Scheduling Order - 8/16/2021. Last day to serve FR Civ P 26(a)(1) disclosures - 8/25/2021. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 6/25/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (msa)
June 24, 2021 Filing 27 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
June 24, 2021 Filing 26 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-02553. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 24, 2021 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER grants #19 Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out-of-State Plaintiffs' Cases. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows: a. Plaintiff Sharon Dyess's case be severed and transferred to the Charleston Division of the Southern District of West Virginia (Civil case 3:20-cv-2553 opened); b. Plaintiff Robert Fix's case be severed and transferred to the Fresno Division of the Eastern District of California (Civil case 3:20-cv-2554 opened); c. Plaintiff Susan Gentile's case be severed and transferred to the Eastern Division of the Northern District of Illinois (Civil case 3:20-cv-2555 opened); d. Plaintiff Michael Gerrow's case be severed and transferred to the Northern Division of the Eastern District of Michigan (Civil case 3:20-cv-2556 opened); e. Plaintiff Karla Henry's case be severed and transferred to the Eastern Division of the Eastern District of Missouri (Civil case 3:20-cv-2557 opened); f. Plaintiff Wanda Kingsland's case be severed and transferred to the Orlando Division of the Middle District of Florida (Civil case 3:20-cv-2558 opened); g. Plaintiff Joyce Mock's case be severed and transferred to the Savannah Division of the Southern District of Georgia (Civil case 3:20-cv-2559 opened); h. Plaintiff Willie James Walker's case be severed and transferred to the Southern Division of the Southern District of Mississippi (Civil case 3:20-cv-2560 opened). Plaintiff Beverly Jarvis is the sole plaintiff with any connection of this forum. Accordingly, she shall remain in the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/27/2020) (jmg) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/24/2021.]
August 27, 2020 Interdistrict Transfer to Southern District of West Virginia, Charleston Division; notice sent via email. All documents available electronically. If receiving court cannot upload, documents are available from PACER (record does not contain restricted documents). Counsel advised to file future documents in Southern District of West Virginia, Charleston Division. (jmg) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/24/2021.]
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: The Court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff Anne Ware's claims against Defendants. The parties shall bear their own costs. Party Anne Ware terminated. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/25/2020) (axm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/24/2021.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 23 Supplemental RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re: #19 MOTION to Sever Claims of Non-Texas Plaintiffs MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Matthews, Melissa) Modified title on 8/25/2020 (awc). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/24/2021.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re: #19 MOTION to Sever Claims of Non-Texas Plaintiffs MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/24/2021.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 21 Appendix in Support filed by Sharon Dyess, Robert Fix, Susan Gentile, Michael Gerow, Karla Henry, Wanda Kingsland, Joyce Mock, Willie James Walker, Anne Ware re #19 MOTION to Sever Claims of Non-Texas Plaintiffs MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/24/2021.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 20 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Sharon Dyess, Robert Fix, Susan Gentile, Michael Gerow, Karla Henry, Wanda Kingsland, Joyce Mock, Willie James Walker, Anne Ware re #19 MOTION to Sever Claims of Non-Texas Plaintiffs MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/24/2021.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Sever Claims of Non-Texas Plaintiffs, MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division filed by Sharon Dyess, Robert Fix, Susan Gentile, Michael Gerow, Karla Henry, Wanda Kingsland, Joyce Mock, Willie James Walker, Anne Ware (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/24/2021.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Sharon Dyess, Robert Fix, Susan Gentile, Michael Gerow, Karla Henry, Beverly Jarvis, Wanda Kingsland, Joyce Mock, Willie James Walker, Anne Ware re: #2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/24/2021.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff re: #15 Order, filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/24/2021.]
July 21, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filling Completed Forms For Each Plaintiff filed by Sharon Dyess, Robert Fix, Susan Gentile, Michael Gerow, Karla Henry, Beverly Jarvis, Wanda Kingsland, Joyce Mock, Willie James Walker, Anne Ware (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/24/2021.]
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: To assist the Court, counsel for all parties shall complete the form attached hereto as Exhibit A for each Plaintiff in this action. The parties shall file their completed forms on or before July 22, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/16/2020) (ndt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/24/2021.]
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court grants the parties' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/1/2020) (ctf) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/24/2021.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Sharon Dyess, Robert Fix, Susan Gentile, Michael Gerow, Karla Henry, Beverly Jarvis, Wanda Kingsland, Joyce Mock, Willie James Walker, Anne Ware (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/24/2021.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 12 replaced with the document flattened on 6/18/2020) (pnp). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/24/2021.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/24/2021.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/24/2021.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/24/2021.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation Attorney Jessica Junek added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft) (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/24/2021.]
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Karen Gren Scholer for all further proceedings. Judge Jane J. Boyle no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 6/12/2020) (svc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/24/2021.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/24/2021.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/24/2021.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/24/2021.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc. re #2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/24/2021.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc. (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/24/2021.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by C. R. Bard, Inc., Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10909274) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement (redacted), #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Court Documents, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 Civil Case Info Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 Citation Issued Bard Peripheral, #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 Citation Issued C. R. Bard, Inc., #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 Citation Issued McKesson, #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 Executed Affidavit of Service - McKesson, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 Return of Service C.R. Bard Inc., #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 Notice of Dismissal Hearing, #16 Exhibit(s) D-10 Return of Service - Bard Peripheral) (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/24/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jarvis et al v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Kingsland
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Dyess
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Gentile
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Gerow
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverley Jarvis
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karla Henry
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie James Walker
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Fix
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Ware
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Mock
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Junek
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E. Jarreau
Represented By: Megan Basham Davis
Represented By: Melissa Foster Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Jessica Junek
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E. Jarreau
Represented By: Megan Basham Davis
Represented By: Melissa Foster Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Junek
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E. Jarreau
Represented By: Megan Basham Davis
Represented By: Melissa Foster Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?