Nasher-Alneam v. United States of America
Petitioner: Muhammed Samer Nasher-Alneam
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2021cv00360
Filed: June 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Cheryl A Eifert
Referring Judge: David A Faber
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Filing 340 Document filed only in criminal case; not applicable to this proceeding. (cbo)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER as to Muhammed Samer Nasher-Alneam: Directing Government to respond to #336 MOTION by Muhammed Samer Nasher-Alneam to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 2255 within 60 days of the entry of this Order; If Movant's claims involve plea or sentencing issues, the United States is ordered to file the plea hearing and/or sentencing hearing transcripts; Movant may, if he wishes, file a reply to the answer of the United States within 60 days after service of the answer by the United States. Cross Reference Criminal Case Number 2:18-cr-00151. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 6/28/2021. (cc: Movant and USA) (tmr)
June 28, 2021 Filing 338 CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF 2255 MOTION by Muhammed Samer Nasher-Alneam to U. S. Attorney with copy to Movant, Judge and Magistrate Judge. (tmr)
June 25, 2021 Filing 337 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: Judge Faber; Magistrate Judge Eifert; Petitioner; USA; USM; USP) Cross Reference Criminal Number 2:18-cr-00151. (klc)
June 24, 2021 CASE assigned to Senior Judge David A. Faber. (klc)
June 24, 2021 Filing 336 MOTION by Muhammed Samer Nasher-Alneam (pro se) to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 2255. Cross Reference Criminal Case Number 2:18-cr-00151. (tmr) Modified document number on 6/25/2021 to correspond to companion criminal action (cbo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nasher-Alneam v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Jennifer Rada Herrald
Represented By: Alan G. McGonigal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Muhammed Samer Nasher-Alneam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?