Hensley v. CitiFinancial Credit Company et al
Plaintiff: Freda J. Hensley
Defendant: CitiFinancial Credit Company, Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, AHP Servicing, LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB and Trustee of Stanwich Mortgage Loan Trust A
Case Number: 2:2021cv00394
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 23 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER directing that the scheduling conference previously scheduled is canceled and the case shall proceed as follows: Amending the pleadings or joining parties - 10/15/2021. Last date to serve discovery requests - 3/4/2022, Opening Rule 26 expert disclosures - 2/18/2022. Responsive Rule 26 expert disclosures - 3/18/2022. Rebuttal Rule 26 expert disclosure - 4/8/2022. Discovery to close - 4/18/2022. Dispositive motions deadline - 5/9/2022. Response to dispositive motion - 5/23/2022. Reply to response to dispositive motion - 5/30/2022. Settlement meeting - 7/11/2022. Motion in limine deadline - 7/18/2022. Responses for motions in limine - 7/25/2022. Proposed pretrial order to defendant - 7/13/2022. Integrated pretrial order - 7/20/2022. Pretrial Conference on 8/11/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Proposed jury charge - 8/23/2022. Final settlement conference on 8/11/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Trial on 8/30/2022 at 9:00 a.m., before the undersigned. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 8/26/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca)
August 23, 2021 Filing 13 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by CitiFinancial Credit Company, Freda J. Hensley, Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, AHP Servicing, LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Trustee of Stanwich Mortgage Loan Trust A. (Price, Bryan) (Modified on 8/25/2021 to add party filers) (kew).
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER construing the parties' #11 Stipulation Extending Date for Response to Motion to Dismiss and/or Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply as a joint motion to extend the time to respond and reply to Defendant CitiFinancial Credit Company's ("Defendant CitiFinancial") #8 MOTION to Dismiss and/or MOTION for Summary Judgment. As such, the Court GRANTS the #11 Motion. Plaintiff shall file her response no later than 8/30/2021. Defendant CitiFinancial shall file its reply to Plaintiff's response no later than 9/15/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 8/19/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (arb)
August 16, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION EXTENDING DATE FOR RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS AND/OR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND REPLY by Freda J. Hensley, CitiFinancial Credit Company. (Pomponio, Bren) (Modified on 8/16/2021 to add party filer) (kew).
August 4, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Trustee of Stanwich Mortgage Loan Trust A. (Konrad, Daniel) (Modified on 8/5/2021 to add party filer) (kew).
August 2, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by CitiFinancial Credit Company in support of #8 MOTION by CitiFinancial Credit Company to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal and/or Motion for Summary Judgment. (Price, Bryan)
August 2, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION by CitiFinancial Credit Company to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal and/or Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Price, Bryan) (Modified on 8/3/2021 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kew).
July 28, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint in the Logan Circuit Court by AHP Servicing, LLC (Attachment: #1 Answer)(Dawson, Christopher)
July 28, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Christopher A. Dawson on behalf of AHP Servicing, LLC. (Dawson, Christopher)
July 23, 2021 Filing 5 CONSENT FOR REMOVAL by CitiFinancial Credit Company (Price, Bryan)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE: Motions under FR Civ P 12(b) - 8/2/2021. Last day for Rule 26(f) meeting - 8/16/2021. Last day to file Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - 8/23/2021. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 2:00 PM on 8/30/2021, before the undersigned, unless canceled. Entry of Scheduling Order - 9/3/2021. Last day to serve FR Civ P 26(a)(1) disclosures - 9/13/2021. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 7/12/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (mfo)
July 11, 2021 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (ts)
July 9, 2021 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (ts)
July 9, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by CitiFinancial Credit Company. (Price, Bryan) (Modified on 7/9/2021 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add jury demand) (kew).
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CitiFinancial Credit Company with summons, First Amended Complaint, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Logan County. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7984967. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (kew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hensley v. CitiFinancial Credit Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freda J. Hensley
Represented By: Bren J. Pomponio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiFinancial Credit Company
Represented By: Bryan N. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Represented By: Daniel J. Konrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AHP Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Christopher A. Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Represented By: Daniel J. Konrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee of Stanwich Mortgage Loan Trust A
Represented By: Daniel J. Konrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?