Chapman v. Wooten et al
Plaintiff: John Chapman
Defendant: Edward Wooten, Cedric Robertson, John Doe and Roshonda Gray
Case Number: 2:2021cv00413
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROPOSED FINDINGS & RECOMMENDATION It is RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's #1 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs be DENIED and that this action be DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. This case is no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. If the PF&R was served electronically, Objections are due by 9/16/2021. If the PF&R was served by mail, Objections are due by 9/20/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 9/2/2021. (cc: Plaintiff; counsel of record) (kew)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #2 Complaint. ERROR: Blank page. CORRECTION: Blank page removed. (kew)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope) (kew) (Modified on 7/23/2021 to remove blank page and replace image) (kew).
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 APPLICATION by John Chapman to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. (kew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chapman v. Wooten et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Wooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedric Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roshonda Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?