Deavers v. Martin et al
Plaintiff: Amy Deavers
Defendant: Joshua Martin, Kanawha County Commission, Scott Lowther and Mike King
Case Number: 2:2021cv00423
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #13 Certificate of Service. ERROR: Certificate of service filed in incorrect civil action. CORRECTION: Image removed. (kew)
September 21, 2021 Filing 13 INCORRECT IMAGE; IMAGE REMOVED. (Modified on 9/22/2021 to remove image filed in incorrect civil action) (kew).
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 MOTION by Amy Deavers for Additional Time for Service Upon Defendants Scott Lowther and Mike King; the dates and deadlines in the #3 Order and Notice are EXTENDED as follows: Motions under FR Civ P 12(b) - 10/15/2021. Last day for Rule 26(f) meeting - 10/29/2021. Last day to file Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - 11/5/2021. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 2:00 PM on 11/12/2021, before the undersigned, unless canceled. Entry of Scheduling Order - 11/17/2021. Last day to serve FR Civ P 26(a)(1) disclosures - 11/26/2021. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 9/15/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)
September 13, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Kanawha County Commission, Joshua Martin. (Hill, Cy) (Modified on 9/13/2021 to add link to #1 notice of removal, to add party filer and jury demand) (kew).
September 13, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION by Amy Deavers for Additional Time for Service Upon Defendants Scott Lowther and Mike King. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Hastings, Stephen)
September 13, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mike King, Scott Lowther, re: Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachment: #1 Summons Issued as to Scott Lowther) (kew)
September 10, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Amy Deavers for Scott Lowther, re: Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal. (Hastings, Stephen) (Modified on 9/12/2021 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kew).
September 10, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Amy Deavers for Mike King, re: Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal. (Hastings, Stephen) (Modified on 9/12/2021 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kew).
September 3, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL to 9/13/2021 by Kanawha County Commission, Joshua Martin, Amy Deavers. (Hill, Cy) (Modified on 9/3/2021 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add party filers) (kew).
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting the #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading; Defendants Kanawha County Commission and Joshua Martin shall file a responsive pleading by 9/3/2021; the remaining Defendants shall similarly file any responsive pleading by 9/3/2021, or until a responsive pleading would otherwise be due. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 8/12/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (btm)
July 30, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION by Kanawha County Commission, Joshua Martin to Extend Time to File Answer to September 3, 2021 (Hill, Cy)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND NOTICE: Motions under FR Civ P 12(b) - 8/23/2021. Last day for Rule 26(f) meeting - 9/7/2021. Last day to file Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - 9/13/2021. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 2:00 PM on 9/17/2021, before the undersigned, unless canceled. Entry of Scheduling Order - 9/22/2021. Last day to serve FR Civ P 26(a)(1) disclosures - 10/1/2021. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 7/30/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (mfo)
July 29, 2021 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
July 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kanawha County Commission and Joshua Martin with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7998641. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (mms)
July 28, 2021 CASE assigned to Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deavers v. Martin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Deavers
Represented By: David F. Nelson
Represented By: Stephen Edward Hastings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Martin
Represented By: Allison M. Subacz
Represented By: Cy A. Hill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kanawha County Commission
Represented By: Allison M. Subacz
Represented By: Cy A. Hill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Lowther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?