Collins v. Searls
Petitioner: Antonio Collins
Respondent: Shelby Searls
Case Number: 2:2021cv00454
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Cheryl A Eifert
Referring Judge: Joseph R Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing Respondent to answer the #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) within 60 days of the entry of this Order showing cause, if any, why the relief sought should not be granted. Petitioner may file a reply to the answer or response within 60 days after service of same by the Respondent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 10/13/2021. (cc: Petitioner; WV Attorney General w/2254 Petition) (arb)
October 12, 2021 Filing 7 Filing Fee: $5.00, Receipt Number CHAR019622. (tmr)
October 12, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE by Antonio Collins to the Court's #5 Order. (kew)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER In addition to completing and submitting the form petition provided by the Clerk of Court, (ECF No. 3), Petitioner is hereby ORDERED to either pay the five dollar ($5.00) filing fee or submit an Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 9/1/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (arb)
August 20, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF PETITION UNDER 28 USC 2254 FOR A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Antonio Collins to Attorney General and Respondent with copy to Petitioner. (tmr)
August 18, 2021 Filing 3 LETTER to Antonio Collins, from Rory L. Perry II dated 8/18/2021, re: opening of case and forwarding Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus forms to be completed and returned to the Clerk's Office. (klc)
August 17, 2021 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
August 16, 2021 CASE assigned to Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. (klc)
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 LETTER-FORM PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Antonio Collins against Shelby Searls pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 2254. (tmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Searls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Antonio Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Shelby Searls
Represented By: Karen Villanueva-Matkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?