Ohio Valley Physicians, Inc. v. Unicare Health Plan of West Virginia, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ohio Valley Physicians, Inc.
Defendant: Unicare Health Plan of West Virginia, Inc., Tadd Haynes, West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources, Bill Crouch, West Virginia Bureau for Medical Services and Cindy Beane
Case Number: 2:2021cv00462
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joseph R Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL/ORDER All claims against Defendants West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources, Bill Crouch, West Virginia Bureau for Medical Services, and Cindy Beane are voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/28/2021. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kew)
September 27, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Without Prejudice of West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources, Bill Crouch, West Virginia Bureau for Medical Services, and Cindy Beane by Ohio Valley Physicians, Inc. (Forbes, W.)
September 17, 2021 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Cindy Beane, Bill Crouch, West Virginia Bureau for Medical Services, West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources in support of #15 MOTION by Cindy Beane, Bill Crouch, West Virginia Bureau for Medical Services, West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources to Dismiss Complaint. (Michels, Gary)
September 17, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION by Cindy Beane, Bill Crouch, West Virginia Bureau for Medical Services, West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal. (Michels, Gary) (Modified on 9/17/2021 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kew).
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL/ORDER Plaintiff voluntarily dismisses Tadd Haynes and Unicare Health Plan of West Virginia, Inc., without prejudice, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(l)(A)(i). Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/8/2021. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kew)
September 8, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of UniCare Health Plan of West Virginia, Inc. and Tadd Haynes Without Prejudice by Ohio Valley Physicians, Inc. pursuant to Rule 41, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Forbes, W.)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Stay Deadlines and Extend the Briefing Schedule re: #2 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Remaining Claims. Response due by 9/8/2021. Reply due by 9/20/2021. It is further ORDERED that the #5 Order and Notice is VACATED pending this court's ruling on the Motion to Compel Arbitration. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/2/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (klc)
September 2, 2021 Filing 11 UNOPPOSED MOTION by Cindy Beane, Bill Crouch, Tadd Haynes, Unicare Health Plan of West Virginia, Inc., West Virginia Bureau for Medical Services, West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources to Stay Deadlines and Extend the Briefing Schedule re: #2 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Remaining Claims. (Williams, Marc)
August 24, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Kimberly Stitzinger-Jones updating name and/or firm information on behalf of West Virginia Bureau for Medical Services, West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources. (Stitzinger-Jones, Kimberly) (Modified on 8/25/2021 to add party filer) (kew).
August 23, 2021 Filing 9 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Rebecca R. Hanson on behalf of Tadd Haynes, Unicare Health Plan of West Virginia, Inc. Local counsel: Marc E. Williams. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8017053. (Williams, Marc)
August 23, 2021 Filing 8 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Martin J. Bishop on behalf of Tadd Haynes, Unicare Health Plan of West Virginia, Inc. Local counsel: Marc E. Williams. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8017051. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Williams, Marc)
August 23, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kimberly Stitzinger-Jones for Gary Michels on behalf of West Virginia Bureau for Medical Services, West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources. (Stitzinger-Jones, Kimberly) (Modified on 8/25/2021 to add party filer) (kew).
August 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kimberly Stitzinger-Jones on behalf of West Virginia Bureau for Medical Services, West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources. (Stitzinger-Jones, Kimberly) (Modified on 8/25/2021 to add party filer) (kew).
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 VACATED PURSUANT TO #12 ORDER ENTERED 9/3/2021: ORDER AND NOTICE: Motions under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) - 9/13/2021. Last day for Rule 26(f) meeting - 9/24/2021. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) meeting - 10/1/2021. Scheduling Conference at 9:00 AM on 10/15/2021 at the Robert C. Byrd United States Courthouse, 300 Virginia Street East, Room 6610 (Library/Conference Room), Charleston, WV. Entry of scheduling order - 10/21/2021. Last day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures - 10/28/2021. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/23/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (kew) (Modified on 9/3/2021 to note order has been vacated)(mk).
August 20, 2021 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
August 19, 2021 CASE assigned to Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. (klc)
August 19, 2021 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Tadd Haynes, Unicare Health Plan of West Virginia, Inc. in support of #2 MOTION by Tadd Haynes, Unicare Health Plan of West Virginia, Inc. to Compel Arbitration and Stay Remaining Claims (Attachment: #1 Certificate of Service)(Williams, Marc)
August 19, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION by Tadd Haynes, Unicare Health Plan of West Virginia, Inc. to Compel Arbitration and Stay Remaining Claims (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service)(Williams, Marc)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Unicare Health Plan of West Virginia, Inc., Tadd Haynes with complaint, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-8014481. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (btm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ohio Valley Physicians, Inc. v. Unicare Health Plan of West Virginia, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohio Valley Physicians, Inc.
Represented By: W. Jesse Forbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unicare Health Plan of West Virginia, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander Chesney Frampton
Represented By: Marc E. Williams
Represented By: Martin J. Bishop
Represented By: Rebecca R. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tadd Haynes
Represented By: Alexander Chesney Frampton
Represented By: Marc E. Williams
Represented By: Martin J. Bishop
Represented By: Rebecca R. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources
Represented By: Gary Lee Michels, II
Represented By: Kimberly Stitzinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Crouch
Represented By: Gary Lee Michels, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Virginia Bureau for Medical Services
Represented By: Gary Lee Michels, II
Represented By: Kimberly Stitzinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Beane
Represented By: Gary Lee Michels, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?