Justice Auto Repair et al v. American Electric Power Service Corporation
Plaintiff: Justice Auto Repair and Billy Justice
Defendant: American Electric Power Service Corporation doing business as Appalachian Power Company and Appalachian Power Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv00476
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joseph R Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER AND NOTICE: Motions under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) - 11/10/2021. Last day for Rule 26(f) meeting - 11/22/2021. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) meeting - 11/29/2021. Scheduling Conference at 9:30 AM on 12/13/2021 at the Robert C. Byrd United States Courthouse, 300 Virginia Street East, Room 6610 (Library/Conference Room), Charleston, WV. Entry of scheduling order - 12/20/2021. Last day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures - 12/27/2021. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/20/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (mfo)
October 19, 2021 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Appalachian Power Company (Horne, Jerad)
October 19, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER TO #5 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Appalachian Power Company. (Horne, Jerad) (Modified on 10/19/2021 to add jury demand) (kew).
October 7, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Jerad K. Horne updating name and/or firm information on behalf of Appalachian Power Company. (Horne, Jerad)
October 6, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION OF DEADLINE FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADING re: #5 Amended Complaint to 10/29/2021 by Appalachian Power Company, Justice Auto Repair, Billy Justice. (Horne, Jerad) (Modified on 10/7/2021 to add link to #5 amended complaint and to add party filers) (kew).
October 6, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jerad K. Horne on behalf of Appalachian Power Company. (Horne, Jerad)
October 1, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Justice Auto Repair, Billy Justice against Appalachian Power Company; jury demanded. (ts)
September 7, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 9/2/2021 as to American Electric Power Service Corporation. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100003166324. (lca)
August 30, 2021 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
August 27, 2021 CASE assigned to Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. (klc)
August 27, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to American Electric Power Service Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (lca)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8019978. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (lca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Justice Auto Repair et al v. American Electric Power Service Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justice Auto Repair
Represented By: Russell A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Justice
Represented By: Russell A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Electric Power Service Corporation doing business as Appalachian Power Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Appalachian Power Company
Represented By: Jerad K. Horne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?