Miller v. Gordon
Plaintiff: Andrew Miller
Defendant: Amanda Gordon
Case Number: 2:2021cv00493
Filed: September 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Referring Judge: Dwane L Tinsley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 Filing 5 LETTER to Andrew Miller, from Clerk of Court dated 9/15/2021, re: enclosing updated docket sheet. (kew)
September 15, 2021 Filing 4 LETTER to Clerk of Court, from Andrew Miller dated 9/15/2021, re: request for updated docket sheet. (kew)
September 15, 2021 Filing 3 LETTER to Clerk of Court, from Andrew Miller re: requesting service. (lca)
September 3, 2021 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
September 2, 2021 CASE assigned to Senior Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
September 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. (Original Complaint missing pages) (kew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?