Cobb v. West Virginia United Health System, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Alisha L. Cobb
Defendant: West Virginia United Health System, Inc. doing business as West Virginia University Health System, Camden-Clark Memorial Hospital Corporation, Sodexo America, LLC, Joyce Moen and Tom Bayles
Case Number: 2:2021cv00597
Filed: November 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Tom Bayles.(Jones, Christopher)
December 28, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY by Alisha L. Cobb to #8 Response In Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Lowe, Cory)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing that the scheduling conference is cancelled and that this case shall proceed as follows: Amending the pleadings or joining parties - 2/7/2022. Last date to serve discovery requests - 8/16/2022. Opening Rule 26 expert disclosures - 8/1/2022. Responsive Rule 26 expert disclosures - 8/31/2022. Rebuttal Rule 26 expert disclosure - 9/16/2022. Discovery to close - 9/30/2022. Dispositive motions deadline - 10/20/2022. Response to dispositive motion - 11/3/2022. Reply to response to dispositive motion - 11/10/2022. Settlement Meeting - 12/21/2022. Motion in limine deadline - 1/20/2023. Responses for motions in limine - 1/27/2023. Proposed pretrial order to defendant - 1/25/2023. Integrated pretrial order - 2/3/2023. Pretrial Conference on 2/10/2023, at 10:00 AM. Proposed jury charge - 2/27/2023. Final settlement conference on 3/6/2023, at 10:00 AM. Trial on 3/7/2023, at 9:00 AM. All proceedings shall be held by the court at the Robert C. Byrd United States Courthouse, Charleston, West Virginia. Signed by Senior Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 12/23/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (msa)
December 22, 2021 Filing 9 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Alisha L. Cobb, West Virginia United Health System, Inc., Camden-Clark Memorial Hospital Corporation, Sodexo America, LLC. (Lowe, Cory) (Modified on 12/23/2021 to add party filers) (ts).
December 21, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE by Sodexo America, LLC in opposition to #5 MOTION by Alisha L. Cobb to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Wood County. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Jones, Christopher)
December 10, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Camden-Clark Memorial Hospital Corporation. (Jones, Christopher)
December 10, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by West Virginia United Health System, Inc. (Jones, Christopher)
December 9, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION by Alisha L. Cobb to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Wood County (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Lowe, Cory)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE: Motions under F.R. Civ. P. 12(b) - 12/6/2021. Last day for Rule 26(f) Meeting - 12/15/2021. Last day to file Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - 12/22/2021. Scheduling Conference at 9:30 AM on 1/7/2022 at the Robert C. Byrd United States Courthouse in Charleston, before the undersigned, unless canceled. Entry of Scheduling Order - 1/14/2022. Last day to serve F.R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) disclosures - 1/26/2022. Signed by Senior Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 11/15/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (arb)
November 12, 2021 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
November 12, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sodexo America, LLC.(Jones, Christopher)
November 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sodexo America, LLC with summons, complaint, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Wood County. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-8076883. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (msa)
November 11, 2021 CASE assigned to Senior Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cobb v. West Virginia United Health System, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alisha L. Cobb
Represented By: Cory Brandon Lowe
Represented By: Jodi Renee Durham
Represented By: Todd S. Bailess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Virginia United Health System, Inc. doing business as West Virginia University Health System
Represented By: Ashley C. Pack
Represented By: Christopher Michael Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camden-Clark Memorial Hospital Corporation
Represented By: Ashley C. Pack
Represented By: Christopher Michael Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sodexo America, LLC
Represented By: Ashley C. Pack
Represented By: Christopher Michael Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Moen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Bayles
Represented By: Christopher Michael Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?