Hall v. Cavalry SPV I, LLC
Plaintiff: Steve Hall
Defendant: Cavalry SPV I, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00600
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2021 Filing 12 REPLY by Cavalry SPV I, LLC to #11 Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Mooney, Nicholas)
December 10, 2021 Filing 11 OPPOSITION by Steve Hall in opposition to #4 MOTION by Cavalry SPV I, LLC to Dismiss ComplaintMOTION by Cavalry SPV I, LLC for Summary Judgment. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A) (Kipnis, Patricia)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER AND NOTICE: Motions under FR Civ P 12(b) - 12/27/2021. Last day for Rule 26(f) meeting - 1/10/2022. Last day to file Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - 1/17/2022. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 02:00 PM on 1/21/2022, before the undersigned, unless canceled. Entry of Scheduling Order - 1/26/2022. Last day to serve FR Civ P 26(a)(1) disclosures - 2/4/2022. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 12/3/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (klc)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Plaintiff's MOTION to Extend Deadline to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Alternatively, for Summary Judgment and extending the deadline to respond by one week. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 11/29/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (mfo)
November 23, 2021 Filing 8 UNOPPOSED MOTION by Steve Hall to Extend Deadline to Respond to the #4 MOTION by Cavalry SPV I, LLC to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal or, Alternatively, for Summary Judgment. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order) (Kipnis, Patricia)
November 23, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan R. Marshall on behalf of Steve Hall. (Marshall, Jonathan)
November 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patricia M. Kipnis on behalf of Steve Hall. (Kipnis, Patricia)
November 19, 2021 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Cavalry SPV I, LLC in support of #4 MOTION by Cavalry SPV I, LLC to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal or, Alternatively, for Summary Judgment. (Mooney, Nicholas)
November 19, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION by Cavalry SPV I, LLC to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal or, Alternatively, for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Mooney, Nicholas) (Modified on 11/22/2021 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kew).
November 15, 2021 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
November 12, 2021 CASE assigned to Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
November 12, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Cavalry SPV I, LLC. (lca)
November 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cavalry SPV I, LLC with summons, complaint, docket sheet, and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Nicholas County. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-8077649. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (lca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Cavalry SPV I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Hall
Represented By: Jordan Lee Adkins
Represented By: Steven R. Broadwater, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan R. Marshall
Represented By: Patricia M. Kipnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cavalry SPV I, LLC
Represented By: Angela L. Beblo
Represented By: Nicholas P. Mooney, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?