Crabill v. West Virginia Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation et al
Plaintiff: Robert Crabill, III
Defendant: West Virginia Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Lt. Andrew Hill and Sgt. John Wilson
Case Number: 2:2022cv00013
Filed: January 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joseph R Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Issuance of Civil Case Subpoena by Robert Crabill, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stroebel, Paul)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 MOTION by Andrew Hill, John Wilson for Leave to Take the Deposition of Robert Crabill, III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 2/24/2022. (cc: counsel of record; Warden, MOCC) (lca)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION by Andrew Hill, John Wilson for Leave to Take the Deposition of Robert Crabill, III. (Parsons, Colton)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley: #18 MOTION by Andrew Hill, John Wilson for Leave to Take the Deposition of Robert Crabill, III. (kew)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Andrew Hill, John Wilson for First Set of Discovery Requests to Plaintiff. (Parsons, Colton)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Andrew Hill, John Wilson for Initial Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures. (Parsons, Colton)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER directing that the scheduling conference is cancelled and that this case shall proceed as follows: Amendment of pleadings and joinder of parties - 5/15/2022. Deadline for written discovery requests - 10/31/2022. Expert disclosure by party with burden of proof - 10/17/2022. Expert disclosure by opposing party - 11/15/2022. Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes - 12/1/2022. Deposition deadline and close of discovery - 12/15/2022. Filing of dispositive motions - 1/4/2023. Responses to dispositive motions - 1/18/2023. Reply to response to dispositive motion - 1/25/2023. Settlement meeting - 3/7/2023. Filing of motions in limine - 3/14/2023. Responses to motions in limine - 3/21/2023. Plaintiff draft of pretrial order to defendant - 3/13/2023. Integrated pretrial order filed by defendant - 3/20/2023. Pretrial conference on 3/27/2023 at 10:00 AM. Proposed jury instructions filed - 4/10/2023. Final settlement conference on 4/17/2023 at 9:00 AM. Trial on 4/18/2023 at 8:30 AM. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 2/11/2022. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (kew)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING DEPOSITION PROTOCOL The parties have agreed to a protocol governing the taking of depositions in this case; directing that the following protocol shall be followed with all depositions conducted herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 2/11/2022. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (msa)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GOVERNING THE INADVERTENT DISCLOSURE OF DOCUMENTS OR OTHER MATERIAL UNDER RULE 502(b) directing that the following procedures herein shall govern the inadvertent production of privileged or confidential documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 2/11/2022. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (msa)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PROTECTIVE ORDER Setting forth the terms for the handling of confidential documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 2/11/2022. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (msa)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER Order Governing the Inadvertent Disclosure of Documents or Other Material Under Rule 502(b) by Andrew Hill, John Wilson, Robert Crabill, III, West Virginia Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation. (Parsons, Colton) (Modified on 2/10/2022 to add party filers) (kew).
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER Order Setting Deposition Protocol by Andrew Hill, John Wilson, Robert Crabill, III, West Virginia Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation. (Parsons, Colton) (Modified on 2/10/2022 to add party filers) (kew).
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER Protective by Andrew Hill, John Wilson, Robert Crabill, III, West Virginia Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation. (Parsons, Colton) (Modified on 2/10/2022 to add party filers) (kew).
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Andrew Hill, John Wilson, West Virginia Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Robert Crabill, III. (Parsons, Colton) (Modified on 2/11/2022 to add party filers) (kew).
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION EXTENDING PLAINTIFF'S TIME TO FILE RESPONSE to #5 MOTION by West Virginia Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation to Dismiss Complaint to 3/28/2022 by West Virginia Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Robert Crabill, III. (David, Caleb) (Modified on 1/28/2022 to add party filer) (kew).
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by West Virginia Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation in support of #5 MOTION by West Virginia Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation to Dismiss Complaint. (David, Caleb)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION by West Virginia Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal. (David, Caleb)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Andrew Hill, John Wilson. (Parsons, Colton)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND NOTICE: Motions under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) - 1/31/2022. Last day for Rule 26(f) meeting - 2/11/2022. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) meeting - 2/18/2022. Scheduling Conference at 9:00 a.m., on 3/4/2022 at the Robert C. Byrd United States Courthouse, 300 Virginia Street East, Room 6610 (Library/Conference Room), Charleston, WV. Entry of scheduling order - 3/9/2022. Last day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures - 3/16/2022. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/10/2022. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (lca)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by West Virginia Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-8107902. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (mfo)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE assigned to Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. (klc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crabill v. West Virginia Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Crabill, III
Represented By: Paul M. Stroebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Virginia Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Represented By: Caleb B. David
Represented By: Lou Ann S. Cyrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Andrew Hill
Represented By: Colton Chase Parsons
Represented By: Michael D. Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. John Wilson
Represented By: Colton Chase Parsons
Represented By: Michael D. Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?