Legg v. Dem 2 Brothers and a Grill II et al
Plaintiff: Scott Legg
Defendant: Dem 2 Brothers and a Grill II and Adrian Wright
Case Number: 2:2022cv00111
Filed: February 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by personal service for Dem 2 Brothers and a Grill II, Adrian Wright, re: #1 Complaint. (Glazer, Hoyt)
March 8, 2022 Filing 5 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Krista Sheets on behalf of Scott Legg. Local counsel: Hoyt Glazer. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8145835. (Glazer, Hoyt)
March 4, 2022 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
March 3, 2022 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dem 2 Brothers and a Grill II, Adrian Wright, re: #1 Original Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Adrian Wright) (klc)
March 3, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #2 Statement of Visiting Attorney. ERROR: Inadvertently sent for docketing by attorney. CORRECTION: Image removed. (ts)
February 28, 2022 Filing 2 INCORRECT ENTRY; IMAGE REMOVED. (Modified on 3/3/2022 to remove image)(ts).
February 28, 2022 Filing 1 ORIGINAL COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8140521. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Dem 2 Brothers and a Grill II, #2 Proposed Summons Adrian Wright, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (klc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Legg v. Dem 2 Brothers and a Grill II et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Legg
Represented By: Hoyt E. Glazer
Represented By: Krista Sheets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dem 2 Brothers and a Grill II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?