Braxton v. Boggess
Plaintiff: Anthony Braxton
Defendant: Mrs. Erica Boggess
Case Number: 2:2022cv00246
Filed: June 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 ij Federal Question Injunction and Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RULE 42(b) MANDATE re: #14 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal to 4CCA in 4CCA Case No. 22-1170. The judgment of this Court, entered 7/27/2022, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. (msa)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF 4CCA as to #14 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal to 4CCA. Upon consideration of the motion to voluntarily dismiss this case pursuant to Rule 42(b) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure, the court grants the motion. (msa)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SUPPLEMENTAL TRANSMITTAL OF NOTICE OF APPEAL TO 4CCA via APPEAL TRANSMITTAL SHEET re: #18 MOTION by Anthony Braxton for an Emergency Temporary Injunction Hearing and #19 Notice to the Court. (kew) (Modified on 7/28/2022 to correct the links) (mk).
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE TO THE COURT by Anthony Braxton re: #14 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal to 4CCA. (kew)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION by Anthony Braxton for an Emergency Temporary Injunction Hearing. (kew) (Modified on 7/25/2022 to remove and replace incorrect image) (kew).
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #18 MOTION by Anthony Braxton for an Emergency Temporary Injunction Hearing. ERROR: Incorrect image attached. CORRECTION: Image removed and replaced. (kew)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL TRANSMITTED TO 4CCA re: #14 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal to 4CCA in 4CCA Case Number 22-1770. (ts)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RECORD REQUEST in 4CCA Case Number 22-1770. (kew)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPELLATE CASE OPENING BY 4CCA re: #14 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal to 4CCA in 4CCA Case No. 22-1770. Case Manager: Kirsten Hancock. (kew)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TRANSMITTAL OF NOTICE OF APPEAL TO 4CCA via APPEAL TRANSMITTAL SHEET re: #14 Notice of Appeal to 4CCA. (ts)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL by Anthony Braxton re: #6 Proposed Findings and Recommendation (original sent to 4CCA). (ts)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 APPLICATION by Anthony Braxton to Proceed on Appeal without Prepayment of Fees (Attachment: #1 Affidavit) (ts)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION by Anthony Braxton for Emergency Temporary Injunction Hearing. (kew)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE by Anthony Braxton to #6 Proposed Findings and Recommendation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Envelope) (kew)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION by Anthony Braxton for Recusal of Judge Irene Berger. (kew)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 OBJECTION to #6 Proposed Findings and Recommendations by Anthony Braxton (pro se). (tmr)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Non-Opposition by Erica Boggess re: #6 Proposed Findings and Recommendation. (Davis, James)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Matthew Davis, Michael M. Fisher on behalf of Erica Boggess. (Davis, James)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the District Court deny the #1 APPLICATION by Anthony Braxton to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Costs and remove this matter from the Court's docket. This case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn. If the PF&R was served electronically, Objections are due by 6/22/2022. If the PF&R was served by mail, Objections are due by 6/27/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 6/8/2022. (cc: Plaintiff) (lca)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER FOR ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES OF CIVIL ACTIONS ASSIGNED TO JUDGE IRENE C. BERGER ENTERED NOVEMBER 12, 2019. This matter referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn for Proposed Findings & Recommendations. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTATION by Anthony Braxton to #2 Complaint. (lca)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF SUIT by Anthony Braxton. (lca)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT AND EMERGENCY TEMPORARY INJUNCTION. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (lca)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 APPLICATION by Anthony Braxton to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Costs. (lca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braxton v. Boggess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Braxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Erica Boggess
Represented By: James Matthew Davis
Represented By: Michael M. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?