Brizuela v. West Virginia Board of Osteopathic Medicine
Plaintiff: Felix Brizuela
Defendant: West Virginia Board of Osteopathic Medicine
Case Number: 2:2022cv00345
Filed: August 18, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Office: Charleston Office
Presiding Judge: Omar J Aboulhosn
Referring Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE by West Virginia Board of Osteopathic Medicine to #17 Objection. (Oxley, Perry)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 OBJECTIONS to #13 MOTION by West Virginia Board of Osteopathic Medicine to Dismiss #1 Complaint by Felix Brizuela. (lca)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 OBJECTION by Felix Brizuela to #13 MOTION by West Virginia Board of Osteopathic Medicine to Dismiss #1 Complaint. (ts)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a response to the #13 MOTION by West Virginia Board of Osteopathic Medicine to Dismiss #1 Complaint by 10/21/2022, with replies due 7 business days after service of the response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 9/22/2022. (cc: Plaintiff; counsel of record) (kew)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER AND NOTICE: Motions under FR Civ P 12(b) - 10/13/2022. Last day for Rule 26(f) meeting - 10/20/2022. Last day to file Report of Parties' Planning Meeting and Scheduling Order Worksheet - 10/27/2022. Scheduling Conference at 2:00 PM in Charleston, West Virginia on 11/17/2022, before the undersigned, unless cancelled. Entry of Scheduling Order - 11/29/2022. Last day to serve FR Civ P 26(a)(1) initial disclosures pre-discovery - 12/6/2022. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 9/21/2022. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (ts)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by West Virginia Board of Osteopathic Medicine in support of #13 MOTION by West Virginia Board of Osteopathic Medicine to Dismiss #1 Complaint. (Oxley, Perry)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION by West Virginia Board of Osteopathic Medicine to Dismiss #1 Complaint. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn. (Oxley, Perry)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING DUE DATE FOR A RESPONSIVE PLEASE TO THE #1 COMPLAINT to 09/21/2022 by West Virginia Board of Osteopathic Medicine, Felix Brizuela. (Oxley, Perry) (Modified on 9/13/2022 to add link to #1 complaint and to add party filer) (kew).
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by U. S. Marshal for service upon West Virginia Board of Osteopathic Medicine, re: #1 Complaint. West Virginia Board of Osteopathic Medicine served on 8/23/2022, answer due 9/13/2022. Person Served: Jonathan Osborne, Executive Director. (btm)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk via U.S. Marshal's Service on behalf of Felix Brizuela for West Virginia Board of Osteopathic Medicine, re: #1 Complaint, returnable 21 days. (Attachment: #1 USM-285 Issued as to West Virginia Board of Osteopathic Medicine) (kew)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER AND NOTICE granting #2 Application to Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs; the Clerk is directed to issue the summons; the United States Marshal's Service is to serve the summons and complaint; the Clerk is directed to pay unpaid costs taxed against plaintiff and pay the balance to plaintiff and plaintiff's attorney should recovery be obtained. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 8/22/2022. (cc: Plaintiff) (kew)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER FOR ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES OF CIVIL ACTIONS ASSIGNED TO JUDGE IRENE C. BERGER ENTERED NOVEMBER 12, 2019. This matter referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn for Proposed Findings & Recommendations. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 1:22-cv-01288. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE - In accordance with the accompanying Memorandum Opinion #5 , IT IS ORDERED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) that this case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 8/18/2022. (caw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 8/18/2022.]
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OPINION (Order to follow as separate docket entry). Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 8/18/2022. (caw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 8/18/2022.]
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number. (lg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 8/18/2022.]
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER (lg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 8/18/2022.]
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION/application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Felix Brizuela, pro se.(lg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 8/18/2022.]
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against West Virginia Board of Osteopathic Medicine lodged pending the disposition of the Motion for In Forma Pauperis, filed by Felix Brizuela, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(lg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 8/18/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brizuela v. West Virginia Board of Osteopathic Medicine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix Brizuela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Virginia Board of Osteopathic Medicine
Represented By: Christopher K. Weed
Represented By: L. R. Sammons, III
Represented By: Perry W. Oxley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?