Folse v. American Electric Power Service Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Jay Folse
Defendant: American Electric Power Service Corporation, Appalachian Power Company, Phillips & Jordan Environmental Services LLC, Phillips & Jordan, Incorporated, Phillips & Jordan Holding, LLC, Phillips and Jordan, Incorporated and Phillips and Jordan Holding, LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv00201
Filed: March 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joseph R Goodwin
Referring Judge: Dwane L Tinsley
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM by American Electric Power Service Corporation, Appalachian Power Company in support of #19 MOTION by American Electric Power Service Corporation, Appalachian Power Company to Dismiss #16 Amended Complaint. (Sorrells, W.)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION by American Electric Power Service Corporation, Appalachian Power Company to Dismiss #16 Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (Sorrells, W.) (Modified on 5/5/2023 to correct link) (kew).
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM by Phillips & Jordan Environmental Services LLC, Phillips and Jordan Holding, LLC, Phillips and Jordan, Incorporated in support of #17 MOTION by Phillips & Jordan Environmental Services LLC, Phillips and Jordan Holding, LLC, Phillips and Jordan, Incorporated to Dismiss #16 Amended Complaint. (Davis, James)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION by Phillips & Jordan Environmental Services LLC, Phillips and Jordan Holding, LLC, Phillips and Jordan, Incorporated to Dismiss #16 Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G-1, #9 Exhibit G-2, #10 Exhibit H-1, #11 Exhibit H-2, #12 Exhibit I) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (Davis, James) (Modified on 5/5/2023 to add link to #16 amended complaint) (kew).
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Jay Folse against American Electric Power Service Corporation, Appalachian Power Company, Phillips & Jordan Environmental Services LLC, Phillips and Jordan Holding, LLC, Phillips and Jordan, Incorporated. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (kew)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael T. Cimino on behalf of Phillips & Jordan Environmental Services LLC, Phillips and Jordan Holding, LLC, Phillips and Jordan, Incorporated. (Cimino, Michael)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for Phillips and Jordan Holding, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Phillips and Jordan Holding, LLC served on 3/20/2023, answer due 4/10/2023. (lca)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for American Electric Power Service Corporation, Phillips & Jordan Environmental Services LLC, Phillips and Jordan, Incorporated, re: #1 Complaint. American Electric Power Service Corporation served on 3/16/2023, answer due 4/6/2023; Phillips & Jordan Environmental Services LLC served on 3/16/2023, answer due 4/6/2023; Phillips and Jordan, Incorporated served on 3/16/2023, answer due 4/6/2023. (lca)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin J. Wilson on behalf of Phillips & Jordan Environmental Services LLC, Phillips and Jordan Holding, LLC, Phillips and Jordan, Incorporated. (Wilson, Benjamin)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Phillips and Jordan Holding, LLC (Davis, James)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Phillips and Jordan, Incorporated (Davis, James)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Phillips & Jordan Environmental Services LLC (Davis, James)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Matthew Davis on behalf of Phillips & Jordan Environmental Services LLC, Phillips and Jordan Holding, LLC, Phillips and Jordan, Incorporated. (Davis, James)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Appalachian Power Company (Sorrells, W.)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant American Electric Power Service Corporation (Sorrells, W.)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by W. Bradley Sorrells on behalf of American Electric Power Service Corporation, Appalachian Power Company. (Sorrells, W.)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directing that by 4/17/2023 Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint personally signed pursuant to Rule 11 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that makes full and complete affirmative assertions of the citizenship of all the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 3/16/2023. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE assigned to Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. (klc)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk for American Electric Power Service Corporation, Appalachian Power Company, Phillips & Jordan Environmental Services LLC, Phillips and Jordan Holding, LLC, Phillips and Jordan, Incorporated, re: #1 Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 2 copies mailed via certified mail. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued as to American Electric Power, #2 Summons issued as to Phillips & Jordan Environmental Services, #3 Summons issued as to Phillips and Jordan Holding LLC, #4 Summons issued as to Phillips and Jordan Inc., #5 Certified Mail receipt for American Electric Power Service Corp., #6 Certified Mail Receipt for AEP, #7 Certified Mail Receipt for Phillips & Jordan Environmental, #8 Certified Mail Receipt for Phillips and Jordan Inc., #9 Certified Mail Receipt for Phillips and Jordan Holding) (lca)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # 2000945. (Attachments: #1 Request for Service, #2 Receipt, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Envelope) (lca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Folse v. American Electric Power Service Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Folse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Electric Power Service Corporation
Represented By: W. Bradley Sorrells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Appalachian Power Company
Represented By: W. Bradley Sorrells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips & Jordan Environmental Services LLC
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: James Matthew Davis
Represented By: Michael T. Cimino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips & Jordan, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips & Jordan Holding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips and Jordan, Incorporated
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: James Matthew Davis
Represented By: Michael T. Cimino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips and Jordan Holding, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: James Matthew Davis
Represented By: Michael T. Cimino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?