Plaintiff v. Defendant
Plaintiff: Plaintiff
Defendant: Defendant
Case Number: 2:2023cv11111
Filed: January 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 77 U.S.C. ยง 7777 Civil Shell Case Opening
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2023 Filing 80 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Tomblin v. Commissioner of Social Security Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8374184. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Disclosure Statement)(Parker, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:23-cv-00176 (klc).
March 1, 2023 Filing 79 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Herman & Cormany v. Employers' Innovative Network Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8373953. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons)(Bosak, David) (Main Document 79 replaced on 3/1/2023; Incomplete document initially filed.) (klc). CIVIL ACTION NO. 2:23-cv-00174 (klc).
February 27, 2023 Filing 78 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Claxton v. Robinson. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8372306. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons)(Salango, C.) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:23-cv-00169 (ts). CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:23-cv-169 (ts).
February 27, 2023 Filing 77 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Furnas v. Appalachian Power Company, et al. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8372296. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Service of Process, #3 Exhibit C - Consent for Removal, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Docket)(Bolen, J.) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:23-cv-00168 (ts).
February 24, 2023 Filing 76 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Trustees of 4th District IBEW Health Fund v. E.L.M. Electric Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8371533. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Proposed Summons)(Dascoli, John) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:23-cv-00165 (klc).
February 24, 2023 Filing 75 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Hatfield v. Commissioner of Social Security (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 In Forma Pauperis, #3 Disclosure Statement)(Parker, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 1:23-cv-00163 (klc).
February 23, 2023 Filing 74 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Structsure Scaffold Solutions v. Structsure Scaffold & Insulation Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8370951. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Ward, Matthew) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:23-cv-00161 (klc).
February 23, 2023 Filing 73 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Kincaid vs. Marfork Coal Company, LLC, et al. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8370780. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, B, C, D, and E)(McHugh, James) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:23-cv-00160 (klc).
February 23, 2023 Filing 72 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Woods v. Dolgencorp Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8370492. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Secretary of State Printout, #3 Exhibit Summons, #4 Exhibit Answer, #5 Exhibit Notice of Removal to All Parties and Court, #6 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet, #7 Exhibit State Court Papers, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Ruggier, Duane) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:23-cv-00154 (klc).
February 22, 2023 Filing 71 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. AVN Corporation v. Research Technologies, LLC. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8369786. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mullins, Michael) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:23-cv-00149 (ts).
February 22, 2023 Filing 70 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Persinger v. Kroger. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8369767. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Answers to Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Docket, #4 Exhibit D - Kroger's Answer to Complaint)(Bolen, J.) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:23-cv-00148 (ts).
February 22, 2023 Filing 69 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Smith v. Commissioner of Social Security. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8369296. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Disclosure Statement)(Parker, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:23-cv-00147 (ts).
February 17, 2023 Filing 68 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Kanwha County Comission v. Dennis West, Gadsden, Gaillard, and West, and Innospec Active Chemicals LLC. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8368107. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- State Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Titus, Gerald) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:23-cv-00142 (ts).
February 17, 2023 Filing 67 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Pennario v. E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, et al. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8367922. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Fitzsimmons, Clayton) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:23-cv-00141 (klc).
February 17, 2023 Filing 66 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Gainer v. E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, et al. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8367918. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Fitzsimmons, Clayton) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:23-cv-00140 (klc).
February 17, 2023 Filing 65 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Kimes v. E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, et al. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8367914. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Fitzsimmons, Clayton) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:23-cv-00139 (klc).
February 17, 2023 Filing 64 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Longwell v. E.I. Du Pont Demours and Company, et al. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8367904. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Fitzsimmons, Clayton) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:23-cv-00138 (klc).
February 17, 2023 Filing 63 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Angela Totten, et al. v. Duane Wolfe, et al. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summons - Duane Wolfe, #3 Proposed Summons Summons - Mike Thompson)(Hedges 1, Daniel) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:23-cv-00137 (klc).
February 16, 2023 Filing 62 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Miller v. Commissioner of Social Security. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8366830. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Disclosure Statement)(Parker, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:23-cv-00131 (ts).
February 15, 2023 Filing 61 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. King v. Smith. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8366478. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Greve, Wendy) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:23-cv-00130 (ts).
February 15, 2023 Filing 60 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. King v. Smith. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8366470. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Greve, Wendy) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:23-cv-00129 (ts).
February 15, 2023 Filing 59 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Calhoun v. Commissioner of Social Security (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 In Forma Pauperis, #3 Disclosure Statement)(Parker, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:23-cv-00124 (ts).
February 14, 2023 Filing 58 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Owens v. CO Haynes. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8365533. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stroebel, Paul) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:23-cv-00123 (ts).
February 14, 2023 Filing 57 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Cremeans v. Commissioner of Social Security (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 In Forma Pauperis, #3 Disclosure Statement)(Parker, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:23-cv-00120 (ts).
February 13, 2023 Filing 56 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Workman v. CO Hockley. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8364718. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stroebel, Paul) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:23-cv-00118 (ts).
February 13, 2023 Filing 55 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Hickman v. Thirty Six Leasing Co. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8364456. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Andrew) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:23-cv-00116 (klc).
February 13, 2023 Filing 54 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. ALPS v. OFFUTT Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8364145. (Durst, Tiffany) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:23-cv-00113 (klc).
February 13, 2023 Filing 53 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Bohmer v. Commissioner of Social Security (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 In Forma Pauperis, #3 Disclosure Statement)(Parker, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:23-cv-00112 (ts).
February 10, 2023 Filing 52 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. McVey v. Dodrill, et al. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8363443. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nelson, David) CIVIL ACTION NO. 2:23-cv-00111 (klc).
February 9, 2023 Filing 51 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Thomas v. Kansas City Life Ins. Co. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8362114. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Carey, Michael) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:23-cv-00107 (klc).
February 8, 2023 Filing 50 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Braden v. USA. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8361679. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)(Amos, Charles) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:23-cv-00106 (ts).
February 8, 2023 Filing 49 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Peoples Bank v. NAVI, Christopher Matthew Craven and Dakota Marie Maddox. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8361558. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)(Hudkins, Trisha) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:23-cv-00105 (ts).
February 7, 2023 Filing 48 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Craft v. Gills, et al. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8360964. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bryan, John) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 1:23-cv-00098 (klc).
February 7, 2023 Filing 47 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Lambert v. Commissioner of Social Security (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 In Forma Pauperis, #3 Disclosure Statement)(Parker, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. 3:23-cv-00096 (klc).
February 7, 2023 Filing 46 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Dickens v. Commissioner of Social Security (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 In Forma Pauperis, #3 Disclosure Statement)(Parker, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:23-cv-00095 (klc).
February 7, 2023 Filing 45 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. United Financial Casualty Company v. Arthur, et al. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8360603. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schuda, Daniel) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:23-cv-00093 (ts).
February 6, 2023 Filing 44 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Viars v. Davey Resource Group, Inc. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8359807. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Weber, Constance) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:23-cv-00092 (klc).
February 6, 2023 Filing 43 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Holstein v. Kijakazi Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8359763. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gillikin, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:23-cv-00091 (klc).
February 3, 2023 Filing 42 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Grimmet v. Sunlight Financial LLC. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8359110. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Docket and State Court Documents, #3 Exhibit B - Long-Term Loan Agreement and Promissory Note, #4 Exhibit C - SEC FORM 10-Q, #5 Exhibit D - Articles of Incorporation, #6 Exhibit E - Notice of Filing a Notice of Removal)(Moore, Branden) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:23-cv-00084 (ts).
February 3, 2023 Filing 41 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Boggess v. Kirk Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8359032. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Summons)(Pruett, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 1:23-cv-00083 (klc).
February 3, 2023 Filing 40 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Hairston v. Officer McGuire Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8359010. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stroebel, Paul) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 1:23-cv-00082 (klc).
February 1, 2023 Filing 39 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Women's Health Center of W.Va. v. Ashish P. Sheth, et al. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8356785. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons - Ashish P. Sheth, #4 Proposed Summons - Matthew Christiansen)(Pomponio, Bren) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:23-cv-00079 (ts).
January 31, 2023 Filing 38 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Rogers, Justin David v. McDowell County Commission, et al. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8355711. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Layne, Jacob) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 1:23-cv-00074 (ts). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/1/2023: #8 Exhibit 7) (ts).
January 30, 2023 Filing 37 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Tara Draughn v. Mountain Health Network, Inc. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8354874. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Amsbary, David) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:23-cv-00073 (ts).
January 30, 2023 Filing 36 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Lockard v. Kijakazi. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8354129. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gillikin, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:23-cv-00070 (ts).
January 27, 2023 Filing 35 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Sanger v. Dodrill, et al. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8353785. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(DiTrapano, L.) CIVIL ACTION NO. 2:23-cv-69(ts).
January 26, 2023 Filing 34 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. C.J., v. Jones, et al. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8352100. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bryan, John) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:23-cv-00063 (ts).
January 25, 2023 Filing 33 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. GenBioPro v. Sorsaia. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8350600. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Majestro, Anthony) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:23-cv-00058 (ts).
January 20, 2023 Filing 32 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Billie Jean Crigger, D.O. v. Raleigh General Hospital, LLC and LifePoint WV Holdings, Inc. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8348416. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(New, Stephen) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:23-cv-00052 (klc). (Attachment: #2 Exhibit 1) (ts). (Modified on 1/20/2023 to add attachment #2) (ts).
January 20, 2023 Filing 31 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Kovach v. LHC Group, Inc. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8348326. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons as to LHC Group, Inc., #3 Proposed Summons as to LHC Group 401(k) Committee, #4 Proposed Summons as to Marcus Macip, #5 Proposed Summons as to Josh Proffitt, #6 Proposed Summons as to Chris Gill, #7 Proposed Summons as to Kimberly Seymour)(Starcher, Kenneth) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:23-cv-00051 (klc).
January 19, 2023 Filing 30 CASE OPENING DOCUMENT FOR A MISCELLANEOUS CASE WITH FEE PAID. Securities and Exchange Commission v. Reliable One Resources, et al. Filing Fee $49.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8347880. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Scott, Bryan) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:23-mc-00020 (ts).
January 19, 2023 Filing 29 APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS BY PERSON IN STATE OR FEDERAL CUSTODY 28 USC 2241 WITH FEE PAID. Cooley v. Nunley Filing Fee $5. Receipt # BWVSDC-8347738. (Hunter, J.) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:23-cv-00050 (klc).
January 19, 2023 Filing 28 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Turley v. Dupont Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8347621. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Fitzsimmons, Clayton) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:23-cv-00049 (klc).
January 19, 2023 Filing 27 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Lowe v. Experian. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8347555. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Whiteaker, Kristina) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:23-cv-00048 (ts).
January 18, 2023 Filing 26 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Ward v. Commissioner of Social Security (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 In Forma Pauperis, #3 Disclosure Statement)(Parker, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:23-cv-00045 (klc).
January 18, 2023 Filing 25 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Walton v. Commissioner of Social Security (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 In Forma Pauperis, #3 Disclosure Statement)(Parker, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:23-cv-00044 (klc).
January 18, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Petty v. Hamrick, et al. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8346116. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brison, M.) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:23-cv-00043 (klc).
January 18, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Davis v. Hamrick, et al. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8346089. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brison, M.) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:23-cv-00042 (klc).
January 17, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Roberts v. WVDCR, et al. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8345331. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Murray, William) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:23-cv-00040 (klc).
January 17, 2023 Filing 21 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Morris v. Mullins et al Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8345323. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Brian Nick Mullins, #3 Proposed Summons Chad Barker, #4 Proposed Summons Boone County Sheriff's Office, #5 Proposed Summons Boone County Commission)(Kuenzel, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:23-cv-00039 (klc).
January 17, 2023 Filing 20 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Adkins v. Daniels et al Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8345290. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Camryn Daniels, #3 Proposed Summons Eddy Arthur, #4 Proposed Summons Danville Police Department, #5 Proposed Summons Town of Danville, #6 Proposed Summons Boone County Sheriff's Office, #7 Proposed Summons Boone County Commission)(Kuenzel, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:23-cv-00038 (klc).
January 17, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Sheppard v. Kroger Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8345075. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's ATI, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Docket, #4 Exhibit D - Time Frame Order)(Mattingly, Alexis) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:23-cv-00037 (klc).
January 16, 2023 Filing 18 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Price v. Commissioner of Social Security Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8344487. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Disclosure Statement)(Parker, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:23-cv-00026 (klc).
January 16, 2023 Filing 17 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Workman v. Commissioner of Social Security (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 In Forma Pauperis, #3 Disclosure Statement)(Parker, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:23-cv-00025 (klc).
January 15, 2023 Filing 16 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Hall v. Bias Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8344424. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Atkinson, John-Mark) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:23-cv-00024 (klc).
January 15, 2023 Filing 15 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Brown v. Bias Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8344423. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Atkinson, John-Mark) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:23-cv-00023 (klc).
January 13, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Lambert v WVDOC et al Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8344284. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Schaefer, Natalie) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:23-cv-00022 (klc).
January 12, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Nicole Copen v. Comprecare Health, LLC Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8343503. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Amsbary, David) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:23-cv-00020 (klc).
January 12, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Syner, John D. v. McDowell County Commission, et al. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8343117. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Layne, Jacob) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 1:23-cv-00018 (ts).
January 9, 2023 Filing 11 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. North Avenue Capital, LLC v. Ranger Scientific LLC. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8340772. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Loan Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - Term Note, #4 Exhibit C - Controlled Account Agreement, #5 Exhibit D - Payment Reserve Account Agreement, #6 Exhibit E - Loan Closing Statement, #7 Exhibit F - Default Notice, #8 Proposed Summons)(Hudkins, Trisha) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:23-cv-00015(ts).
January 9, 2023 Filing 10 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Eagon v. Cabell County EMS, et al. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8340053. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons CCEMS, #3 Proposed Summons CCEMS Agent, #4 Proposed Summons Dir. Merry, #5 Proposed Summons HPD, #6 Proposed Summons Smith, #7 Proposed Summons Anderson, #8 Proposed Summons Creamans, #9 Proposed Summons Capt. Merritt, #10 Proposed Summons Sheriff Dept, #11 Proposed Summons County Commission, #12 Proposed Summons Sheriff Zerkle)(Bastress, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:23-cv-00013 (ts).
January 6, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Teresa Morgan v. Midland Credit Management, Inc. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8339899. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Manning, Jason) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 1:23-cv-00012 (ts).
January 6, 2023 Filing 8 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Bryant v. United States of America. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # BWVSDC-8339099. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Headley, Brian) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:23-cv-00011 (ts).
January 5, 2023 Filing 7 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Davis v. Blankenship. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8338725. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stroebel, Paul) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:23-cv-00010 (ts).
January 5, 2023 Filing 6 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Jerell Johnson v. Santander Consumer USA, Inc., et al. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8338596. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons: Santander, #3 Proposed Summons: Experian, #4 Proposed Summons: Equifax)(Sheridan, Benjamin) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:23-cv-00008 (ts).
January 5, 2023 Filing 5 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Blair v. Commissioner of Social Security. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8338050. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Disclosure Statement)(Parker, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:23-cv-00007 (ts).
January 4, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Randolph v. Columbia Gas. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8337759. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Raupp, Peter) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:23-cv-00006(ts).
January 4, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Amanda Asbury v. Pocahontas Coal Company, LLC d/b/a Affinity Coal Company, LLC et al. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8337547. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Consent, #5 Consent, #6 Consent, #7 Proof of Service)(Smith, Amy) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:23-cv-00005 (ts).
January 4, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Hollaway v. WV Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8337488. (Schaefer, Natalie) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:23-cv-00004 (ts).
January 2, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Blake v. Commissioner of Social Security (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 In Forma Pauperis, #3 Disclosure Statement)(Parker, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:23-cv-00001 (klc).
January 1, 2023 2023 CIVIL SHELL CASE OPENING.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plaintiff v. Defendant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?