Batten v. Anderson Equipment Company
Plaintiff: Joshua Batten doing business as B. J. Industries, an entity doing business in the State of West Virginia
Defendant: Anderson Equipment Company
Case Number: 2:2024cv00291
Filed: June 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing that the scheduling conference is cancelled and that this case shall proceed as follows: Amending the pleadings or joining parties - Plaintiff 9/3/2024, Defendant 9/10/2024. Last date to serve discovery requests - 11/15/2024. Opening Rule 26 expert disclosures - 10/31/2024. Responsive Rule 26 expert disclosures - 12/2/2024. Rebuttal Rule 26 expert disclosure - 12/16/2024. Discovery to close - 12/30/2024. Dispositive motions deadline - 1/21/2025. Response to dispositive motion - 2/4/2025. Reply to response to dispositive motion - 2/11/2025. Settlement Meeting - 3/24/2025. Motion in limine deadline - 3/31/2025. Responses for motions in limine - 4/7/2025. Proposed pretrial order to defendant - 3/26/2025. Integrated pretrial order - 4/2/2025. Pretrial Conference on 4/11/2025 at 11:00 AM. Proposed jury charge - 5/5/2025. Final settlement conference on 5/12/2025 at 10:00 AM. Trial on 5/13/2025 at 9:30 AM. All proceedings shall be held by the court at the Robert C. Byrd United States Courthouse, Charleston, West Virginia. Signed by Senior Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 6/27/2024. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
June 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Anderson Equipment Company, Joshua Batten. (Barton, J.) (Modified on 6/27/2024 to add party filer) (kew).
June 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 as to Joshua Batten. (ts)
June 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Anderson Equipment Company in support of #5 MOTION by Anderson Equipment Company to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal or, in the alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment. (Barton, J.)
June 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION by Anderson Equipment Company to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal or, in the alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment. (Barton, J.)
June 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE: Motions under F.R. Civ. P. 12(b) - 7/8/2024. Last day for Rule 26(f) Meeting - 7/17/2024. Last day to file Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - 7/24/2024. Scheduling Conference at 10:00 AM on 8/2/2024 at the Robert C. Byrd United States Courthouse in Charleston, before the undersigned, unless canceled. Entry of Scheduling Order - 8/7/2024. Last day to serve F.R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) disclosures - 8/16/2024. Signed by Senior Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 6/14/2024. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (mfo)
June 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: counsel of record and any pro se party) (klc)
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order CASE assigned to Senior Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Anderson Equipment Company. (mfo)
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Anderson Equipment Company with summons, complaint, docket sheet, and other miscellaneous documents from the Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-8673779. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (mfo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Batten v. Anderson Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson Equipment Company
Represented By: J. Tyler Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Batten doing business as B. J. Industries, an entity doing business in the State of West Virginia
Represented By: Arthur Wayne King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?