Deem et al v. Newrez, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Scott Deem and Stephanie Deem
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon and Newrez LLC and doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Case Number: 2:2024cv00401
Filed: August 5, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joseph R Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND NOTICE: Motions under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) - 9/26/2024. Last day for Rule 26(f) meeting - 10/9/2024. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) meeting - 10/16/2024. Scheduling Conference at 9:00 AM on 10/30/2024 at the Robert C. Byrd United States Courthouse, 300 Virginia Street East, Room 6610 (Library/Conference Room), Charleston, WV. Entry of scheduling order - 11/6/2024. Last day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures - 11/13/2024. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/5/2024. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (mfo)
September 4, 2024 Filing 7 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint by Newrez LLC.(Kluemper, Tai)
September 4, 2024 Filing 6 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint by The Bank of New York Mellon.(Kluemper, Tai)
August 21, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 8/12/2024 as to Newrez LLC. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100003984140. (mfo)
August 21, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 8/12/2024 as to The Bank of New York Mellon. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100003984133. (mfo)
August 6, 2024 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: counsel of record and any pro se party) (klc)
August 5, 2024 CASE assigned to Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. (klc)
August 5, 2024 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Newrez, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachment: #1 Summons as to The Bank of New York Mellon) (skm)
August 5, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8705403. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (skm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deem et al v. Newrez, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Tai Shadrick Kluemper
Represented By: Nicholas P. Mooney, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newrez LLC and doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Tai Shadrick Kluemper
Represented By: Nicholas P. Mooney, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Deem
Represented By: Sarah K. Brown
Represented By: Colten Lewis Fleu
Represented By: Bren J. Pomponio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Deem
Represented By: Sarah K. Brown
Represented By: Colten Lewis Fleu
Represented By: Bren J. Pomponio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?