Pierson v. Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Pierson, Sr.
Defendant: Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company doing business as M&T Bank and Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 2:2024cv00521
Filed: September 24, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2024 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joshua Pierson, Sr. for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production of Documents, and Requests for Admission to Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC. (Marshall, Jonathan)
November 20, 2024 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joshua Pierson, Sr. for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production of Documents and Requests for Admission to Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company d/b/a M&T Bank. (Marshall, Jonathan)
November 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER directing that the scheduling conference is cancelled and that this case shall proceed as follows: The amendment of any pleading and the joinder of any party shall be completed no later than 12/20/2024. Last date to serve discovery requests - 7/25/2025. All discovery to be completed - 8/22/2025. Last date to complete depositions - 9/12/2025. Opening Rule 26 expert disclosures - 7/3/2025. Responsive Rule 26 expert disclosures - 8/1/2025. Rebuttal Rule 26 expert disclosure - 8/15/2025. Motion for Class Certification - 10/31/2025. Dispositive motions deadline - 12/5/2025. Responses to dispositive motions are due within 14 days, with replies due within 7 days. Settlement Meeting must be held 45 days prior to Pretrial Conference. Mediation must be concluded 30 days prior to Pretrial Conference. A written status report is due within 5 days of completion of mediation. If the case is not settled, all Rule 26(a)(3) disclosures are due 30 days prior to Pretrial Conference. Motions in limine deadline - 3/6/2026. Responses for motions in limine - 3/13/2026. Proposed voir dire, jury instructions, and verdict form - 4/13/2026. The Plaintiff's portion of the proposed integrated pretrial order shall be submitted to opposing counsel by 4/8/2026, Integrated pretrial order - 4/15/2026. Pretrial Conference/Final Settlement Conference on 4/22/2026 at 9:00 AM. Trial on 5/4/2026 at 9:00 AM before the undersigned. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 11/12/2024. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (mk)
October 31, 2024 Filing 8 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Joshua Pierson, Sr., Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company. (Marshall, Jonathan) (Modified on 11/1/2024 to add party filers) (kew).
October 15, 2024 Filing 7 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company, Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC. (Manning, Jason)
October 2, 2024 ***SET ANSWER DEADLINES for Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC and Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company to 10/15/2024. (kew)
October 1, 2024 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL to 10/15/2024 by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company, Joshua Pierson, Sr. (Manning, Jason) (Modified on 10/2/2024 to add party filer) (kew).
September 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE: Motions under FR Civ P 12(b) - 10/17/2024. Last day for Rule 26(f) meeting - 10/24/2024. Last day to file Report of Parties' Planning Meeting and Scheduling Order Worksheet - 10/31/2024. Scheduling Conference at 2:30 PM in Charleston, West Virginia on 11/21/2024, before the undersigned, unless cancelled. Entry of Scheduling Order - 11/27/2024. Last day to serve FR Civ P 26(a)(1) initial disclosures pre-discovery - 12/4/2024. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 9/26/2024. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (mfo)
September 25, 2024 Filing 4 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER FOR ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES OF CIVIL ACTIONS ASSIGNED TO JUDGE IRENE C. BERGER ENTERED NOVEMBER 12, 2019. This matter referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn for Discovery. (cc: counsel of record and any pro se party) (klc)
September 24, 2024 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
September 24, 2024 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant M&T Bank. (mfo)
September 24, 2024 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC. (mfo)
September 24, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, and Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company, with summons, class action complaint and docket sheet from the Circuit Court of Logan County. Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-8738782. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (mfo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pierson v. Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Pierson, Sr.
Represented By: Patricia M. Kipnis
Represented By: Jonathan R. Marshall
Represented By: Jed Robert Nolan
Represented By: Benjamin Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company doing business as M&T Bank
Represented By: John C. Lynch
Represented By: Jason E. Manning
Represented By: David M. Asbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: John C. Lynch
Represented By: Jason E. Manning
Represented By: David M. Asbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?